Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024488

EP2024488 - METAL-ENHANCED CHEMILUMINESCENCE (MEC) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.08.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, FR, GB, SI
published on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Geddes, Chris
817 Deepwood Court
Bel Air, MD 21015 / US
[2017/40]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
The University of Maryland Biotechnology Institute
Columbus Center 701 East Pratt Street, Suite 200
Baltimore, MD 21202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/40]
Former [2009/08]01 / GEDDES, Chris, D.
817 Deepwood Court
Bel Air, MD 21015 / US
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2018/03]
Former [2011/16]Chalk, Anthony John , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate
York, Yorkshire YO1 6JX / GB
Former [2009/08]Chalk, Anthony John
Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds
LS2 8DD / GB
Application number, filing date07756908.513.02.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US62041
Priority number, dateUS20060773037P13.02.2006         Original published format: US 773037 P
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007095527
Date:23.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2024488
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2024488
Date:17.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.12.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/76, G01N21/55, G01N33/553, // G01N21/552
[2017/35]
Former International [2013/04]G01N21/76, G01N21/55, G01N33/553
Former International [2009/08]C12M1/34, C12M3/00, C12P21/06, C12P33/00, C12Q1/68, G01N21/00, G01N21/75, G01N33/53, G01N33/543, G01N33/551, G01N33/553
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/03]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:METALLVERBESSERTE CHEMILUMINESZENZ (MEC)[2009/08]
English:METAL-ENHANCED CHEMILUMINESCENCE (MEC)[2009/08]
French:CHIMIOLUMINESCENCE AMÉLIORÉE PAR LES MÉTAUX (MEC)[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2008National basic fee paid 
11.09.2008Search fee paid 
11.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
24.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2017Fee for grant paid
20.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2017
Opposition(s)18.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
20.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
19.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
18.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
IE13.02.2018
LU13.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
FR19.03.2018
BG17.04.2018
GB17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
DE01.09.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
IE13.02.2018
LU13.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
DE01.09.2018
Former [2019/07]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
LU13.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
DE01.09.2018
Former [2018/52]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
LU13.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/38]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
GR18.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
Former [2018/35]CY17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
Former [2018/34]FI17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2003082633  (MARTIN MARK T [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0151] * * paragraph [0159] * * paragraph [0166] * * paragraph [0178] * * figures 2a,4,5,6 *;
 [Y]  - JIAN ZHANG ET AL, "First observation of surface plasmon-coupled electrochemiluminescence", CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, (20040801), vol. 393, no. 4-6, doi:10.1016/j.cplett.2004.06.050, ISSN 0009-2614, pages 483 - 487, XP055048062 [Y] 1-9 * page 483, column r, paragraph l - page 484, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 484, column r, paragraph 4 * * page 485, column l, paragraph l - page 487, column l, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cplett.2004.06.050
 [A]  - KADIR ASLAN ET AL, "Microwave-Accelerated Metal-Enhanced Fluorescence: Platform Technology for Ultrafast and Ultrabright Assays", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (20051201), vol. 77, no. 24, doi:10.1021/ac0516077, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 8057 - 8067, XP055048061 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac0516077
International search[X]US5779976  (LELAND JONATHAN K [US], et al);
 [A]US4672040  (JOSEPHSON LEE [US]);
 [A]US6362011  (MASSEY RICHARD J [US], et al);
 [A]US6066448  (WOHLSTADTER JACOB N [US], et al)
by applicantUS2003082633
    - JIAN ZHANG ET AL., "First Observation of Surface Plasmon-Coupled Electrochemiluminescence", CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, (20040801), vol. 393, no. 4-6, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cplett.2004.06.050, pages 483 - 487, XP055048062

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cplett.2004.06.050