Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1999658

EP1999658 - CREATION AND UTILIZATION OF RELATIONAL TAGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amazon Technologies, Inc.
P.O. Box 8102
Reno, NV 89507 / US
[2008/50]
Inventor(s)01 / TSENG, Walter, M.
1200 12th Avenue South
Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98144-2734 / US
02 / FRANK, Martin, R.
1200 12th Avenue South
Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98144-2734 / US
03 / GOLDSTEIN, Michel, L.
1200 12th Avenue South
Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98144-2734 / US
 [2019/48]
Former [2008/50]01 / TSENG, Walter, M.
1200 12th Avenue South Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98144-2734 / US
02 / FRANK, Martin, R.
1200 12th Avenue South Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98144-2734 / US
03 / GOLDSTEIN, Michel, L.
1200 12th Avenue South Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98144-2734 / US
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/48]
Former [2008/50]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date07757821.902.03.2007
[2008/50]
WO2007US63207
Priority number, dateUS2006027653903.03.2006         Original published format: US 276539
US2006053744629.09.2006         Original published format: US 537446
[2008/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007103807
Date:13.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/37]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1999658
Date:10.12.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2007
[2008/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1999658
Date:27.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.04.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/06, G06Q20/10, G06Q40/04, G06F16/955, G06N5/02, G06Q30/02
[2019/15]
Former International [2012/16]G06N5/02, G06Q30/00, G06Q20/00
Former International [2008/50]G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/48]
Former [2008/50]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG RELATIONALER TAGS[2008/50]
English:CREATION AND UTILIZATION OF RELATIONAL TAGS[2008/50]
French:CRÉATION ET UTILISATION D'ÉTIQUETTES RELATIONNELLES[2008/50]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2008National basic fee paid 
03.09.2008Search fee paid 
03.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/50]
15.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2019Fee for grant paid
23.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
14.10.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
16.10.2019Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
25.10.2019Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.03.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002143659  (KEEZER PAULA [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0088] * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2005203807  (BEZOS JEFFREY P [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] - [0018] , [0032] , [0066] , [0071] *;
 [Y]US2006041548  (PARSONS JEFFREY [CA], et al) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0098] *;
 [AP]  - CHOY, LUI, "Web Information Retrieval in Collaborative Tagging Systems", ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 - NEW YORK USA, China, (2006), XP040061688 [AP] 1-18 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2005203807  (BEZOS JEFFREY P [US], et al);
 [Y]US2006041548  (PARSONS JEFFREY [CA], et al);
 [Y]US2006031263  (ARROUYE YAN [US], et al);
 [A]US2002007309  (REYNAR JEFF [US]);
 [A]US2003056222  (IWATA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al)
by applicantUS2002143659
 US2005203807
 US2006041548