Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1994055

EP1994055 - ANTI-5T4 ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.05.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
15.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wyeth LLC
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017-5755 / US
[2014/10]
Former [2008/48]For all designated states
Wyeth
Five Giralda Farms
Madison, NJ 07940 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BOGHAERT, Erwin, R.
93 Ludlam Road
Monroe, NY 10950 / US
02 / DAMLE, Nitin, K.
53 Stevenson Lane
Upper Saddle River, NJ 07458 / US
03 / HAMANN, Philip, Ross
9 Jacobs Road
Thiells, NY 10984 / US
04 / KHANDKE, Kiran
120 Eant Allison Avenue
Nanuet, NY 10954 / US
05 / KUNZ, Arthur
11 Jennifer Drive
New City, NY 10956 / US
06 / MARQUETTE, Kimberly, A.
66 Springfield Street
Apt. 1
Somerville, MA 02143 / US
07 / TCHISTIAKOVA, Lioudmila
19 Abbot Bridge Drive
Andover, MA 01810 / US
08 / GILL, Davinder
20 Charlotte Drive
Andover, MA 01810 / US
09 / SREEKUMAR, Kodangattil
140 Parker Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US
 [2014/28]
Former [2014/08]01 / BOGHAERT, Erwin, R.
93 Ludlam Road
Monroe, NY 10950 / US
02 / DAMLE, Nitin, K.
53 Stevenson Lane
Upper Saddle River, NJ 07458 / US
03 / HAMANN, Philip, Ross
9 Jacobs Road
Thiells, NY 10984 / US
04 / KHANDKE, Kiran
120 Eant Allison Avenue
Nanuet, NY 10954 / US
05 / KUNZ, Arthur
11 Jennifer Drive
New City, NY 10956 / US
06 / MARQUETTE, Kimberly, A.
66 Springfield Street
Apt. 1
Somerville, MA 02143 / US
07 / TCHISTIAKOVA, Lioudmila
19 Abbot Bridge Drive
Andover, MA 01810 / US
08 / GILL, Davinder
20 Charlotte Drive
Andover, MA 01810 / US
09 / SREEKUMAR, Kodangattil, Raman
140 Parker Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US
Former [2008/49]01 / BOGHAERT, Erwin, R.
93 Ludlam Road
Monroe, NY 10950 / US
02 / DAMLE, Nitin, K.
53 Stevenson Lane
Upper Saddle River, NJ 07458 / US
03 / HAMANN, Philip, Ross
9 Jacobs Road
Thiells, NY 10984 / US
04 / KHANDKE, Kiran
120 Eant Allison Avenue
Nanuet, NY 10954 / US
05 / KUNZ, Arthur
11 Jennifer Drive
New City, NY 10956 / US
06 / MARQUETTE, Kimberly, A.
66 Springfield Street Apt. 1
Somerville, MA 02143 / US
07 / TCHISTIAKOVA, Lioudmile
19 Abbot Bridge Drive
Andover, MA 01810 / US
08 / GILL, Davinder
20 Charlotte Drive
Andover, MA 01810 / US
09 / SREEKUMAR, Kodangattil, Raman
140 Parker Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US
Former [2008/48]01 / BOGHAERT, Erwin, R.
93 Ludlam Road
Monroe, NY 10950 / US
02 / DAMLE, Nitin, K.
53 Stevenson Lane
Upper Saddle River, NJ 07458 / US
03 / HAMANN, Philip, Ross
9 Jacobs Road
Thiells, NY 10984 / US
04 / KHANDKE, Kiran
120 Eant Allison Avenue
Nanuet, NY 10954 / US
05 / KUNZ, Arthur
11 Jennifer Drive
New City, NY 10956 / US
06 / MARQUETTE, Kimberly, A.
66 Springfield Street Apt. 1
Somerville, MA 02143 / US
07 / TCHISTIAKOVA, Lioudmile
19 Abbot Bridge Drive
Andover, MA 01810 / US
08 / GILL, Davinder
20 Charlotte Drive
Andover, MA 01810 / US
09 / SREEKUMAR, Kodangattil
140 Parker Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US
Representative(s)Pfizer
European Patent Department
23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
[2012/32]
Former [2010/28]Porter, Jonathan Philip
Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Former [2008/48]Denholm, Anna Marie
Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Huntercombe Lane South Taplow, Maidenhead
Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB
Application number, filing date07758256.709.03.2007
[2008/48]
WO2007US63685
Priority number, dateUS20060781346P10.03.2006         Original published format: US 781346 P
US20070891248P23.02.2007         Original published format: US 891248 P
[2008/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007106744
Date:20.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1994055
Date:26.11.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007
[2008/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1994055
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/00, C07K16/30
[2013/52]
Former International [2008/48]C07K16/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN 5T4 UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON[2008/48]
English:ANTI-5T4 ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF[2008/48]
French:ANTICORPS ANTI-5T4 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2008/48]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2008National basic fee paid 
11.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/48]
12.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.11.2013
12.11.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
22.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2014Fee for grant paid
21.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP11154157.9  / EP2368914
EP18213944.4  / EP3539989
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.02.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.04.2015  08.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstr. 124
4070 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 02  01.04.2015  08.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2016/51]
Opponent(s)01  01.04.2015  08.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstr. 124
4070 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 02  01.04.2015  08.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Arnold + Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
Former [2015/20]
Opponent(s)01  01.04.2015  08.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstr. 124
4070 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 02  01.04.2015  08.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon Biopharmaceuticals B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Visscher, Inge
IP Research
P.O.Box 7071
6503 GN Nijmegen / NL
08.05.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.01.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
23.02.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition21.04.2017Appeal received No.  T1007/17
05.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
08.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
07.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
08.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
MT02.07.2014
[2017/03]
Former [2015/46]CY02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
Former [2015/23]CY02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
Former [2015/12]CY02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
Former [2015/11]CY02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT02.07.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO03038098  (OXFORD BIOMEDICA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-47 * page 2, line 11 - page 9, line 4 * * example -; claim - *;
 [PX]WO2006042158  (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-47 * page 1, line 35 - page 2, line 17 * * page 8, line 9 - line 17 * * page 18, line 16 - page 29, line 25 * * page 25, line 26 - page 26, line 16 * * example 3; claim - *;
 [PX]WO2006031653  (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-47 * page 1, line 7 - line 11 * * page 4, line 10 - line 26 * * example -; claim - *
 [X]  - FORSBERG G ET AL, "THERAPY OF HUMAN NON-SMALL-CELL LUNG CARCINOMA USING ANTIBODY TARGETING OF A MODIFIED SUPERANTIGEN", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, LONDON, GB, (20010706), vol. 85, no. 1, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 129 - 136, XP001145660 [X] 1-47 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1054/bjoc.2001.1891
 [X]  - SHAW A D M ET AL, "Isolation of a high affinity scFv from a monoclonal antibody recognising the oncofoetal antigen 5T4", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA - GENERAL SUBJECTS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (20001215), vol. 1524, no. 2-3, ISSN 0304-4165, pages 238 - 246, XP004275928 [X] 1-47 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-4165(00)00165-3
 [X]  - SHAW DAVID M ET AL, "Glycosylation and epitope mapping of the 5T4 glycoprotein oncofoetal antigen", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, THE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY, LONDON, GB, (20020401), vol. 363, no. 1, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 137 - 145, XP002444306 [X] 1-47 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/0264-6021:3630137
 [X]  - MYERS K A ET AL, "TARGETING IMMUNE EFFECTOR MOLECULES TO HUMAN TUMOR CELLS THROUGH GENETIC DELIVERY OF 5T4-SPECIFIC SCFV FUSION PROTEINS", CANCER GENE THERAPY, NORWALK, CT, US, (200211), vol. 9, no. 11, ISSN 0929-1903, pages 884 - 896, XP009007160 [X] 1-47 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.cgt.7700513
 [A]  - MYERS K A ET AL, "ISOLATION OF A CDNA ENCODING 5T4 ONCOFETAL TROPHOBLAST GLYCOPROTEIN", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (19940325), vol. 269, no. 12, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 9319 - 9324, XP002064468 [A] 1-47 * abstract *
 [A]  - WOODS ANDREW M ET AL, "Characterization of the murine 5T4 oncofoetal antigen: A target for immunotherapy in cancer", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, THE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY, LONDON, GB, (20020815), vol. 366, no. 1, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 353 - 365, XP002341798 [A] 1-47 * abstract *
Examination   - FORSBERG GORAN ET AL, "Identification of framework residues in a secreted recombinant antibody fragment that control production level and localization in Escherichia coli", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1997), Database accession no. PREV199799570562
    - FORSBERG GORAN ET AL, "Identification of framework residues in a secreted recombinant antibody fragment that control production level and localization in Escherichia coli", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 272, no. 19, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 12430 - 12436
    - HOLE N ET AL, "A 72KD TROPHOBLAST GLYCOPROTEIN DEFINED BY A MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1988), Database accession no. PREV198886028330
    - HOLE N ET AL, "A 72KD TROPHOBLAST GLYCOPROTEIN DEFINED BY A MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (1988), vol. 57, no. 3, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 239 - 246
    - HOLE N ET AL, "ISOLATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF 5T4 A TUMOR-ASSOCIATED ANTIGEN", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US, (19900101), vol. 45, no. 1, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 179 - 184
    - CLACKSON T ET AL, "Making antibody fragments using phage display libraries", 19910815, (19910815), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628
    - PORTOLANO STEFANO ET AL, "Lack of promiscuity in autoantigen-specific H and L chain combinations as revealed by human H and L chain "Roulette"", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1993), Database accession no. PREV199395074573
    - PORTOLANO STEFANO ET AL, "Lack of promiscuity in autoantigen-specific H and L chain combinations as revealed by human H and L chain "Roulette"", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 150, no. 3, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 880 - 887
by applicantWO8907947
 US5869053
 WO9855607
 US2003018004
 US2003040606
 WO9109967
 US4196265
 US4946778
 US5091513
 US5132405
 US5260203
 US5677427
 US5892019
 US5985279
 US6054561
 WO02096948
 US5739277
 US2003017534
 US4970198
 US4671958
 US5053394
 US5037651
 US5079233
 US5108912
 US5606040
 US5770710
 US2002197262
 US5952329
 US2003032995
 US5773001
 US2004082764
 US2006002942
 US6024938
 US6461603
 US6309633
 US5648095
 US5712374
 US5714586
 US5739116
 US5877296
 US6310185
    - REFF ET AL., CANCER CONTROL, (2002), vol. 9, pages 152 - 66
    - SIEVERS, CANCER CHEMOTHER. PHARMACOL., (2000), vol. 46, pages 18 - 22
    - GOLDENBERG, CRIT. REV. ONCOL. HEMATOL., (2001), vol. 39, pages 195 - 201
    - SIEVERS ET AL., BLOOD, (1999), vol. 93, pages 3678 - 84
    - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NAFL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 5
    - QUEEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 10029 - 33
    - NEWMAN ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY (NY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 1455 - 60
    - GREEN ET AL., NAT. GENET., (1994), vol. 7, pages 13 - 21
    - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 97
    - MAGDELENAT, J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1992), vol. 150, pages 133 - 43
    - HOLE, BR. J. CANCER, (1988), vol. 57, pages 239 - 46
    - HOLE ET AL., INT J. CANCER, (1990), vol. 45, pages 179 - 84
    - MYERS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 9319 - 24
    - SOUTHALL ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1990), vol. 61, pages 89 - 95
    - MIEKE ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 3, pages 1923 - 1930
    - STARZYNSKA ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1994), vol. 69, pages 899 - 902
    - STARZYNSKA ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1992), vol. 66, pages 867 - 869
    - JONES ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1990), vol. 61, pages 96 - 100
    - CONNOR; STERN, LNT. J. CANCER, vol. 46, pages 1029 - 1034
    - ALI ET AL., ORAL ONCOLOGY, (2001), vol. 37, pages 57 - 64
    - MULDER ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 3, pages 1923 - 30
    - NAGANUMA ET AL., ANTICANCER RES., (2002), vol. 22, pages 1033 - 1038
    - STARZYNSKA ET AL., EUR. J. GASTROENTEROL. HEPATOL, (1998), vol. 10, pages 479 - 484
    - WRIGLEY ET AL., INT. J. GYNECOL. CANCER, (1995), vol. 5, pages 269 - 274
    - SHAW ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (2002), vol. 363, pages 137 - 45
    - WOODS ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (2002), vol. 366, pages 353 - 65
    - MYERS ET AL., CANCER GENE THER., (2002), vol. 9, pages 884 - 896
    - SHAW ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2000), vol. 1524, pages 238 - 246
    - MYERS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, no. 12, pages 9319 - 9324
    - HOLE, INT. J. CANCER, (1990), vol. 45, pages 179 - 184
    - BENINCOSA ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2000), vol. 292, pages 810 - 6
    - KALOFONOS ET AL., EUR. J. CANCER, (1994), vol. 30A, pages 1842 - 50
    - SUBRAMANIAN ET AL., PEDIATR. INFECT. DIS. J., (1998), vol. 17, pages 110 - 5
    - MARTIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 9268 - 9272
    - MARTIN ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1991), vol. 203, pages 121 - 153
    - PEDERSEN ET AL., IMMUNOMETHODS, (1992), vol. 1, page 126
    - REES ET AL., REES ET AL., STERNBERG M.J.E., Protein Structure Prediction, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1996), pages 141 - 172
    - PADLAN ET AL., FASEB J., (1995), vol. 9, pages 133 - 139
    - PADLAN, MOL. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 28, pages 489 - 98
    - PADLAN ET AL., FASEB J., (1995), vol. 9, pages 133 - 9
    - WOLFF ET AL., CANCER RES., (1993), vol. 53, pages 2560 - 5
    - STEVENSON ET AL., ANTICANCER DRUG DES., (1989), vol. 3, pages 219 - 30
    - YANG ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 254, pages 392 - 403
    - MARKS ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY (NY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783
    - LOW ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 260, pages 359 - 368
    - PATTEN ET AL., CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL, (1997), vol. 8, pages 724 - 733
    - THOMPSON ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 256, pages 77 - 88
    - CRAMERI ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 288 - 291
    - POTTER ET AL., INT. REV. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 10, no. 2-3, pages 103 - 112
    - HOUDEBINE, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL, (2002), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 625 - 629
    - SCHILLBERG ET AL., CELL MOL. LIFE SCI., (2003), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 433 - 45
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH, (1981), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489
    - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BLOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453
    - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 2444 - 2448
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410
    - BAKKER ET AL., J. NUCL. MED., (1990), vol. 31, pages 1501 - 1509
    - CHATTOPADHYAY ET AL., NUCL. MED. BIOL., (2001), vol. 28, pages 741 - 744
    - DEWANJEE ET AL., J. NUCL. MED., (1994), vol. 35, pages 1054 - 63
    - KRENNING ET AL., LANCET, (1989), vol. 1, pages 242 - 244
    - SAGIUCHI, ANN. NUCL. MED., (2001), vol. 15, pages 267 - 270
    - YOO ET AL., J. NUCL. MED., (1997), vol. 38, pages 294 - 300
    - KRENNING ET AL., LANCET, (1989), vol. 1, pages 242 - 4
    - BAKKER ET AL., J. NUCL. MED., (1990), vol. 31, pages 1501 - 9
    - JONES ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2001), vol. 254, pages 85 - 98
    - HOVES ET AL., METHODS, (2003), vol. 31, pages 127 - 34
    - PENG ET AL., CHIN. MED. SCI. J., (2002), vol. 17, pages 17 - 21
    - YASUHARA ET AL., J. HISTOCHEM. CYTOCHEM, (2003), vol. 51, pages 873 - 885
    - BOGHAERT ET AL., CHN. CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 10, pages 4538 - 4549
    - ONN ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 9, no. 15, pages 5532 - 5539
 US20030699874