Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1996987

EP1996987 - ROBOT CONFINEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
iRobot Corporation
8 Crosby Drive
Bedford, MA 01730 / US
[2018/44]
Former [2008/49]For all designated states
Irobot Corporation
8 Crosby Drive
Bedford, MA 01730 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SANDIN, Paul E.
22 Laurel Crest
Brookline, New Hampshire 03033 / US
02 / JONES, Joseph L.
9 Redwood Road
Acton, Massachusetts 01720 / US
03 / OZICK, Daniel N.
131 Warren Street
Newton, Massachusetts 02459 / US
04 / COHEN, David A.
25 Englewood Avenue, 6
Brookline, Massachusetts 02445 / US
05 / LEWIS, David M. Jr
17 Dearborn Rd
Burlington, MA 01803 / US
06 / VU, Clara
96 Lexington Avenue
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US
07 / DUBROVSKY, Zivthan A.
17 Lincoln Street
Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US
08 / PRENETA, Joshua B.
210 Salem Road
Billerica, MA 01821 / US
09 / MAMMEN, Jeffry W.
3 Bobolink Road
Westford, Massachusetts 01886 / US
10 / GILBERT, Duane L.
80 Black Brook Road
Goffstown, New Hampshire 03045 / US
11 / CAMPBELL, Tony L.
54 Harbor Street
Pepperell, Massachusetts 01463 / US
12 / BERGMAN, John
306 Townsvalley Road
River Falls, Wisconsin 54022 / US
 [2018/44]
Former [2018/25]01 / SANDIN, Paul E.
22 Laurel Crest
Brookline, New Hampshire 03033 / US
02 / JONES, Joseph L.
9 Redwood Road
Acton, Massachusetts 01720 / US
03 / OZICK, Daniel N.
131 Warren Street
Newton, Massachusetts 02459 / US
04 / COHEN, David A.
25 Englewood Avenue, 6
Brookline, Massachusetts 02445 / US
05 / LEWIS, JR., David M.
9 Fairview Avenue
Tyngsboro, Massachusetts 01879 / US
06 / VU, Clara
96 Lexington Avenue
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US
07 / DUBROVSKY, Zivthan A.
17 Lincoln Street
Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US
08 / PRENETA, Joshua B.
210 Salem Road
Billerica, MA 01821 / US
09 / MAMMEN, Jeffry W.
3 Bobolink Road
Westford, Massachusetts 01886 / US
10 / GILBERT, Duane L.
80 Black Brook Road
Goffstown, New Hampshire 03045 / US
11 / CAMPBELL, Tony L.
54 Harbor Street
Pepperell, Massachusetts 01463 / US
12 / BERGMAN, John
306 Townsvalley Road
River Falls, Wisconsin 54022 / US
Former [2008/49]01 / SANDIN, Paul E.
22 Laurel Crest
Brookline, New Hampshire 03033 / US
02 / JONES, Joseph L.
9 Redwood Road
Acton, Massachusetts 01720 / US
03 / OZICK, Daniel N.
131 Warren Street
Newton, Massachusetts 02459 / US
04 / COHEN, David A.
25 Englewood Avenue, 6
Brookline, Massachusetts 02445 / US
05 / LEWIS, JR., David M.
9 Fairview Avenue
Wakefield, Massachusetts 01880 / US
06 / VU, Clara
96 Lexington Avenue
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US
07 / DUBROVSKY, Zivthan A.
17 Lincoln Street
Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US
08 / PRENETA, Joshua B.
2109 Salem Road
Billerica, MA 01821 / US
09 / MAMMEN, Jeffry W.
3 Bobolink Road
Westford, Massachusetts 01886 / US
10 / GILBERT, Duane L.
80 Black Brook Road
Goffstown, New Hampshire 03045 / US
11 / CAMPBELL, Tony L.
54 Harbor Street
Pepperell, Massachusetts 01463 / US
12 / BERGMAN, John
306 Townsvalley Road
River Falls, Wisconsin 54022 / US
Representative(s)Peterreins Schley
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3
80331 München / DE
[2018/44]
Former [2008/49]Peterreins, Frank
Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight BusinessTowers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8
80807 München / DE
Application number, filing date07758835.819.03.2007
[2008/49]
WO2007US64323
Priority number, dateUS20060783268P17.03.2006         Original published format: US 783268 P
US20060803030P23.05.2006         Original published format: US 803030 P
US20060865069P09.11.2006         Original published format: US 865069 P
[2008/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007109624
Date:27.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1996987
Date:03.12.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007
[2008/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1996987
Date:31.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:G05D1/02
[2008/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/44]
Former [2008/49]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINGRENZUNG FÜR ROBOTER[2008/49]
English:ROBOT CONFINEMENT[2008/49]
French:CONFINEMENT DE ROBOT[2008/49]
Entry into regional phase23.09.2008National basic fee paid 
23.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/49]
26.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
07.09.2018Fee for grant paid
07.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.09.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
25.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15202591.2  / EP3067771
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2017
Opposition(s)01.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SI31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
LU19.03.2019
[2020/01]
Former [2019/50]AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SI31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/46]AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/40]AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AT31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AT31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT31.10.2018
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2005113990  (PELESS EHUD [IL] ET AL) [X] 1,10 * figures 3,4 * * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] , [0044] , [0045] * [Y] 2-8,11;
 [PA]US2006293794  (HARWIG JEFFREY L [US] ET AL) [PA] 1-8,10,11 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0076]; figures 12-14 *;
 [A]WO0038029  (NOTETRY LTD [GB]; BISSET DAVID LINDSEY [GB]; CLARK ALAN GERARD [GB]) [A] 1-8,10,11 * figures 2,3 * * page 4, line 30 - page 7, line 10 *;
 [A]GB2382157  (RUFFNER BRYAN J [US]) [A] 1-8,10,11 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - BOHN J ET AL, "Super-distributed RFID Tag Infrastructures", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (20041111), vol. 3295, ISSN 0302-9743, pages 1 - 12, XP002403762 [Y] 2-8,11 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KUBITZ O ET AL, "Application of radio frequency identification devices to support navigation of autonomous mobile robots", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1997, IEEE 47TH PHOENIX, AZ, USA 4-7 MAY 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970504), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-3659-3, pages 126 - 130, XP010228763 [A] 1-8,10,11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1997.596332
 [A]  - SVETLANA DOMNITCHEVA, "Smart Vacuum Cleaner ? An Autonomous Location-Aware Cleaning Device", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON UBIQUITOUS COMPUTING, XX, XX, (20040910), pages 1 - 2, XP002403761 [A] 1-8,10,11 * the whole document *