Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027709

EP2027709 - METHOD AND SYSTEM TO PROVIDE ACCESS NETWORK INFORMATION TO A SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.10.2010
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2010Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.11.2010  [2010/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Motorola, Inc.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / KELLEY, Sean S.
4951 N. Tamarack Drive
Barrington, Illinois 60010 / US
02 / HARRIS, John M.
1321 Wolfram Street
Chicago, Illinois 60657 / US
03 / WILD, Johanna A.
Seitzstr. 17
80538 Muenchen, Bavaria / DE
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Openshaw, Paul Malcolm
Openshaw & Co.
8 Castle Street
Farnham
Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Openshaw, Paul Malcolm
Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham
Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
Application number, filing date07759063.622.03.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US64575
Priority number, dateUS2006042084830.05.2006         Original published format: US 420848
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007143249
Date:13.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2027709
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/42
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON ZUGANGSNETZINFORMATIONEN FÜR EINEN DIENST[2009/09]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM TO PROVIDE ACCESS NETWORK INFORMATION TO A SERVICE[2009/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE FOURNITURE D'INFORMATIONS DE RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS À UN SERVICE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase30.12.2008National basic fee paid 
30.12.2008Search fee paid 
04.06.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/29]
20.09.2010Application withdrawn by applicant  [2010/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006294244  (NAQVI SHAMIM A [US], et al)