Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020935

EP2020935 - INTERSPINOUS PROCESS BRACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.02.2013
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.03.2013  [2013/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc.
2500 Silveus Crossing
Warsaw, IN 46581 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / BRUNEAU, Aurelien
865 Harbor Isle Circle W.
Memphis Tennessee, 38103 / US
02 / CARLS, Thomas A.
848 River Park
Memphis, Tennessee 38103 / US
03 / LANGE, Eric C.
1990 Brooks Bluff Cove
Collierville, Tennessee 38017 / US
04 / TRIEU, Hai H.
1323 Graystone Lane
Cordova, Tennessee 38016 / US
05 / LIM, Roy K.
7273 Great Oaks Road
Germantown, Tennessee 38138 / US
06 / ANDERSON, Kent M.
1215 Geneve Court
Livermore, CA 94551 / US
 [2009/13]
Former [2009/09]01 / BRUNEAU, Aurelien
865 Harbor Isle Circle W.
Memphis Tennessee, 38103 / US
02 / CARLS, Thomas A.
848 River Park
Memphis, Tennessee 38103 / US
03 / LANGE, Eric C.
1990 Brooks Bluff Cove
Collierville, Tennessee 38017 / US
04 / TRIEU, Hai H.
1323 Graystone Lane
Cordova, Tennessee 38016 / US
05 / LIM, Roy K.
7273 Great Oaks Road
Germantown, Tennessee 38138 / US
06 / ANDERSON, Kent M.
1310 Bocage Cove Number 201
Memphis, Tennessee 38103 / US
Former [2009/07]01 / BRUNEAU, Aurelien
8301 Crimson Creek Drive
Memphis, Tennessee 38016 / US
02 / CARLS, Thomas A.
848 River Park
Memphis, Tennessee 38103 / US
03 / LANGE, Eric C.
1990 Brooks Bluff Cove
Collierville, Tennessee 38017 / US
04 / TRIEU, Hai H.
1323 Graystone Lane
Cordova, Tennessee 38016 / US
05 / LIM, Roy K.
7273 Great Oaks Road
Germantown, Tennessee 38138 / US
06 / ANDERSON, Kent M.
1310 Bocage Cove Number 201
Memphis, Tennessee 38103 / US
Representative(s)Price, Nigel John King
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Price, Nigel John King
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2009/49]Price, Nigel John King
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2009/07]Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley
Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield
South Yorkshire S1 2JA / GB
Application number, filing date07759073.522.03.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US64590
Priority number, dateUS2006041361628.04.2006         Original published format: US 413616
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007127550
Date:08.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020935
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/70
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTERSPINÖSES DISTANZSTÜCK[2009/07]
English:INTERSPINOUS PROCESS BRACE[2009/07]
French:ENTRETOISE D'APOPHYSE ÉPINEUSE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase20.11.2008National basic fee paid 
20.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
20.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
02.09.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/10]
07.11.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201206   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XA]FR2681525  (MEDICAL OP [FR], et al) [X] 1-6 * figure 2 * [A] 9,11;
 [XA]FR2722087  (CAHLIK MARC ANDRE [FR]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * figures 2,4 * [A] 9,11;
 [A]US2005143738  (ZUCHERMAN JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5-9,11 * paragraphs [0064] , [0070]; figures 1,2 *