Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1996063

EP1996063 - FIBER OPTIC INSTRUMENT SENSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CZ, FI
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2013/39]
Former [2011/40]For all designated states
KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2008/49]For all designated states
Hansen Medical, Inc.
380 North Bernardo Avenue
Mountain View, California 94043-5207 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SCHLESINGER, Randall, L.
258 Del Mar Way
San Mateo, CA 94403 / US
02 / KING, Toby, St.John
62 Brook Lane
Warsash
Hampshire S031 9FG / GB
03 / LUNDMARK, David
916 Seena Avenue
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
 [2019/27]
Former [2008/49]01 / SCHLESINGER, Randall, L.
258 Del Mar Way
San Mateo, CA 94403 / US
02 / KING, Toby, St.John
62 Brook Lane Warsash
Hampshire S031 9FG / GB
03 / LUNDMARK, David
916 Seena Avenue
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
Representative(s)Lecomte & Partners
76-78, rue de Merl
2146 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [2019/27]Lecomte & Partners
P.O. Box 1623
1016 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2008/49]Lecomte, Didier
Lecomte & Partners Sàrl P.O.Box 1623
1016 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date07759199.822.03.2007
[2008/49]
WO2007US64728
Priority number, dateUS20060785001P22.03.2006         Original published format: US 785001 P
US20060788176P31.03.2006         Original published format: US 788176 P
[2008/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007109778
Date:27.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1996063
Date:03.12.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2007
[2008/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1996063
Date:03.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/00, A61M25/00, G01D5/353, G02B6/02, G01B11/16, A61B5/06, A61B1/005, A61M25/01, G02B23/26, A61B34/30, A61B34/00, A61B34/20
[2019/02]
Former International [2008/49]A61B1/00, A61M25/00, G01B11/16, G01D5/353, G02B6/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/27]
Former [2008/49]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ERFASSUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINEM FASEROPTISCHEN INSTRUMENT[2008/49]
English:FIBER OPTIC INSTRUMENT SENSING SYSTEM[2008/49]
French:INSTRUMENT DE DETECTION MEDICAL A FIBRE OPTIQUE[2008/49]
Entry into regional phase29.09.2008National basic fee paid 
29.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/49]
26.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2019Fee for grant paid
21.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19173731.1  / EP3545815
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.01.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
02.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
01.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ03.07.2019
FI03.07.2019
LT03.07.2019
NL03.07.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/08]LT03.07.2019
NL03.07.2019
Former [2020/07]NL03.07.2019
Cited inInternational search[XAY]WO0133165  (ADVANCED SENSOR TECHNOLOGY LLC [US]; BUCHOLTZ FRANK [US]) [X] 1,2,4-9,11,13-16 * figures 1-9C; claims 1-4,6,7,9,11,13,14,17 * * page 1, line 5 - line 8 * * page 3, line 3 - line 18 * * page 5, line 15 - page 8, line 17 * * page 13, line 17 - page 19, line 26 * * page 20, line 14 - line 18 * * page 23, line 10 - page 24, line 2 * [A] 10,12 [Y] 3;
 [DXA]US2006013523  (CHILDLERS BROOKS A [US] ET AL) [DX] 1,2,4-12,15,16 * figures 1-7; claims 14,18,19 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0014] - [0019] - [0031] , [0032] , [0035] - [0040] * [A] 3,13,14;
 [XA]US6611700  (VILSMEIER STEFAN [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,9,11,14,16 * figures 1,2; claims 11-13,17 * * column 2, line 6 - line 33 * * column 3, line 15 - column 5, line 60 * [A] 3,5-8,10,12,13,15;
 [XA]US2001021843  (BOSSELMANN THOMAS [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,3-6,9,10,15,16 * figures 1-4; claims 17,21-23,25,29-36,38,40,44-49,52-56 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] - [0011] - [0014] , [0016] - [0018] - [0023] - [0027] - [0030] - [0036] * [A] 2,7,8,11-14;
 [XA]US2004165810  (FUJITA HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10,12,15,16 * figures 1-8,11 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] - [0015] - [0028] - [0041] * [A] 3,11,13,14;
 [Y]WO2005087128  (HANSEN MEDICAL INC [US]; WALLACE DANIEL T [US]; MOLL FREDERIC H [US];) [Y] 3 * claims 16,17 * * page 1, line 3 - line 16 * * page 3, line 1 - line 21 * * page 31, line 15 - page 32, line 11 * * page 39, line 23 - page 41, line 21 *;
 [A]US6716178  (KILPATRICK DEBORAH [US] ET AL) [A] 2-16 * the whole document *