Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027577

EP2027577 - GAME CONTROLLER SIMULATING A GUITAR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 08.05.2019 [2019/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HARMONIX MUSIC SYSTEMS, INC.
675 Massachusetts Avenue, 6th floor
Cambridge MA 02139 / US
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / LOPICCOLO, Gregory, B.
Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.
675 Massachusetts Avenue
6th Floor
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
02 / KAY, Robert
Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.
675 Massachusetts Avenue
6th Floor
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
03 / BROSIUS, Eric, J.
Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.
675 Massachusetts Avenue
6th Floor
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
04 / SUSSMAN, Daniel, K.
Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.
675 Massachusetts Avenue
6th Floor
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
05 / EGOZY, Eran, B.
Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.
675 Massachusetts Avenue
6th Floor
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[2019/19]
Former [2009/09]01 / LOPICCOLO, Gregory, B.
Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. 675 Massachusetts Avenue 6th Floor
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
02 / KAY, Robert
Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. 675 Massachusetts Avenue 6th Floor
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
03 / BROSIUS, Eric, J.
Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. 675 Massachusetts Avenue 6th Floor
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
04 / SUSSMAN, Daniel, K.
Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. 675 Massachusetts Avenue 6th Floor
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
05 / EGOZY, Eran, B.
Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. 675 Massachusetts Avenue 6th Floor
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[2019/19]
Former [2009/09]Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date07759662.529.03.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US65458
Priority number, dateUS20060743938P29.03.2006         Original published format: US 743938 P
US2006056661504.12.2006         Original published format: US 566615
US2006060965410.12.2006         Original published format: US 609654
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007115072
Date:11.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027577
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2027577
Date:08.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:G10H1/34, G10H1/36, A63F13/20, A63F13/814, A63F13/245, A63F13/22
[2018/46]
Former International [2009/09]G10H1/34, G10H1/36
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/19]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPIELSTEUEREINHEIT, DIE EINE GITARRE SIMULIERT[2018/46]
English:GAME CONTROLLER SIMULATING A GUITAR[2009/09]
French:MANETTE DE JEU SIMULANT UN INSTRUMENT DE MUSIQUE[2009/09]
Former [2009/09]SPIELSTEUERUNG ZUR SIMULATION EINER GITARRE
Entry into regional phase10.10.2008National basic fee paid 
10.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
10.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
08.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.10.2018
02.10.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
31.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2019Fee for grant paid
19.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.05.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201105   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1081680  (KONAMI CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5,6,9,11-14,17,36 * paragraphs [0009] - [0033] - [0043]; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US2004244566  (STEIGER H M [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,21,23,27,30,31,36 * paragraphs [0028] - [0050] - [0088] , [0127] , [0136] , [0141]; figures 1,6 *;
 [X]WO2004008430  (THURDIS DEVELOPMENTS LTD [IE], et al) [X] 1,2,7,9,11-13,21,23-27,30-32,36 * page 1, line 5 - page 8, line 11; claims 9-12,16 * * page 10, line 1 - page 12, line 13 * * page 21, lines 22-26; figures 3,5,10 * * page 24, line 4 - page 25, line 27 *;
 [A]US6111179  (MILLER TERRY [US]) [A] 1-36 * column 3, line 52 - column 6, line 4; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]DE19833989  (JENSCH DANIEL [DE]) [A] 1-36 * abstract *;
 [A]WO8601927  (DYNACORD ELECT GERAETEBAU [DE]) [A] 1-36 * abstract *