blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2002361

EP2002361 - EXPANDED SNIPPETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 11.04.2018  [2018/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2017/45]
Former [2008/51]For all designated states
Google, Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway, Building 41
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FONTES, Paul
111 N. Rengstorff Avenue 159
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
02 / BATTLE, Alexis
3015 South Court
Palo Alto, California 94306 / US
03 / ANDERSON, Corin
2390 West Middlefield Road, 13
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
 [2008/51]
Representative(s)Anderson, Oliver Ben, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/51]Betten & Resch
Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 (Fünf Höfe)
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date07759675.729.03.2007
[2008/51]
WO2007US65472
Priority number, dateUS2006039419231.03.2006         Original published format: US 394192
[2008/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2007115079
Date:11.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2002361
Date:17.12.2008
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2008/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.11.2007
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/30
[2008/51]
CPC:
G06F16/951 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/51]
TitleGerman:ERWEITERTE AUSSCHNITTE[2008/51]
English:EXPANDED SNIPPETS[2008/51]
French:RÉSUMÉS DÉVELOPPÉS[2008/51]
Entry into regional phase30.09.2008National basic fee paid 
30.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
30.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/51]
02.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2011Date of oral proceedings
31.10.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/15]
31.10.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
01.03.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/15]
Appeal following examination30.12.2011Appeal received No.  T0912/12
12.03.2012Statement of grounds filed
13.02.2018Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
Divisional application(s)EP17204204.6
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.06.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2006001920  (GOOGLE INC [US], et al) [A] 1,17,18,34,35* abstract *;
 [X]US2006069670  (KHALIQ SIRAJ [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * paragraph [0042]; figure 4a * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraphs [0058] , [0059] , [0062] , [0064]; figure 6 *;
 [X]  - JONES S ET AL, "Interactive document summarisation using automatically extracted keyphrases", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 35TH ANNUAL HAWAII INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEM SCIENCES, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20010107), ISBN 0-7695-1435-9, pages 1287 - 1296, XP010587397 [X] 1-35 * page 1287, column L, paragraph L * * section 4.3; figures 1,2 *
ExaminationUS2002042799
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.