Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024865

EP2024865 - AUTOMATIC AUTHORING AND PUBLISHING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.01.2013
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.02.2013  [2013/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OmegaBlue, Inc.
725 Arizona Avenue, Suite 304
Santa Monica, CA 90401 / US
[2010/04]
Former [2009/42]For all designated states
Grigoriadis, Irene
6463 Surfside Way
Malibu, CA 90265 / US
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Omega Blue, Inc.
6463 Surfside Way
Malibu CA 90265 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GRIGORIADIS, Irene
6463 Surfside Way
Malibu, California 90265 / US
02 / RAMIREZ, Victor A.
6180 Laurel Canyon Boulevard
North Hollywood, California 91606 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Kensett, John Hinton , et al
Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford
WD18 0JU / GB
[2010/04]
Former [2009/08]Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford
Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB
Application number, filing date07761019.420.04.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US67092
Priority number, dateUS2006037976921.04.2006         Original published format: US 379769
US2006055343726.10.2006         Original published format: US 553437
US2007067746121.02.2007         Original published format: US 677461
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007124425
Date:01.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2024865
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.09.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/00, G06F17/30
[2012/16]
Former International [2009/08]G06F17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHES AUTOREN- UND VERÖFFENTLICHUNGSSYSTEM[2009/08]
English:AUTOMATIC AUTHORING AND PUBLISHING SYSTEM[2009/08]
French:SYSTEME AUTOMATIQUE DE REDACTION ET DE PUBLICATION[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase20.11.2008National basic fee paid 
20.11.2008Search fee paid 
20.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
20.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
25.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.09.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/09]
10.10.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/09]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.04.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]WO9108538  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [I] 1-27 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - line 11 * * page 2, line 31 - line 36 * * page 3, line 31 - page 6, line 36 * * page 8, line 4 - line 34 * * page 12, line 9 - line 14 * * page 12, line 24 - line 30 * * page 13, line 1 - line 27 * * page 15, line 12 - line 15 * * page 17, line 1 - page 18, line 4 *;
 [I]EP1494128  (SAP AG [DE]) [I] 1-27 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] *;
 [I]WO9834179  (TIME BASE PTY LIMITED [AU], et al) [I] 1-27 * abstract * * page 9, line 8 - line 15 * * page 10, line 31 - page 11, line 10 *;
 [I]US5892513  (FAY ROBERT G [US]) [I] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [I]  - FRANCOIS P, "Generalized SGML repositories: Requirements and modelling", COMPUTER STANDARDS AND INTERFACES, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA. LAUSANNE, CH, (19960101), vol. 18, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0920-5489(95)00031-3, ISSN 0920-5489, pages 11 - 24, XP004006104 [I] 1-27 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0920-5489(95)00031-3
International search[Y]US6377956  (HSU LIANG-HUA [US], et al);
 [Y]US2004049742  (YOKOYAMA YOSHIAKIRA [JP], et al);
 [AE]US7278094  (DREYER MARK G [US], et al);
 [A]US6167409  (DEROSE STEVEN J [US], et al);
 [A]US2005050442  (POPE CARTER [US], et al)