Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020042

EP2020042 - LOW DIMENSIONAL THERMOELECTRICS FABRICATED BY SEMICONDUCTOR WAFER ETCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.04.2011
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.05.2011  [2011/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2009/06]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SEKER, Fazila
5 Newburry Court
Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US
02 / SHARIFI, Fred
1365 Van Antwerp Road
Schenectady, NY 12309 / US
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth
Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2009/06]Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth
GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London
WC2N 6LU / GB
Application number, filing date07761082.223.04.2007
[2011/01]
WO2007US67169
Priority number, dateUS2006043308712.05.2006         Original published format: US 433087
[2011/01]
Former [2009/27]deleted
Former [2009/06]US2006043308712.05.2006
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007133894
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020042
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:H01L35/30, H01L35/34
[2009/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MITTELS HALBLEITERWAFERÄTZUNG HERGESTELLTE NIEDERDIMENSIONALE THERMOELEKTRISCHE ELEMENTE[2009/06]
English:LOW DIMENSIONAL THERMOELECTRICS FABRICATED BY SEMICONDUCTOR WAFER ETCHING[2009/06]
French:THERMOÉLECTRIQUES DE FAIBLES DIMENSIONS FABRIQUÉS PAR GRAVURE DE PLAQUETTES SEMI-CONDUCTRICES[2009/06]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2008National basic fee paid 
25.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/19]
13.12.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/18]
01.02.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201004   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2005161662  (MAJUMDAR ARUN [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0161] - paragraph [0168]; figure 30 *;
 [DPY]US2006266402  (ZHANG AN-PING [US], et al) [DPY] 1-22 * figures 1-15 *;
 [Y]US2003047204  (FLEURIAL JEAN-PIERRE [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO02073699  (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * page 28, line 8 - line 28; figure 9 *;
 [A]WO03046265  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [YD]  - FUJIKURA H ET AL, "Electrochemical formation of uniform and straight nano-pore arrays on (001) InP surfaces and their photoluminescence characterizations", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PART 1 (REGULAR PAPERS, SHORT NOTES & REVIEW PAPERS) JAPAN SOC. APPL. PHYS JAPAN, (200007), vol. 39, no. 7B, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 4616 - 4620, XP002487615 [YD] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.39.4616
 [Y]  - KLEIMANN P ET AL, "Toward the formation of three-dimensional nanostructures by electrochemical etching of silicon", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, (20050428), vol. 86, no. 18, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 183108 - 183108, XP012065279 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1924883
 [A]  - WANG W ET AL, "A new type of low power thermoelectric micro-generator fabricated by nanowire array thermoelectric material", MICROELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20050401), vol. 77, no. 3-4, ISSN 0167-9317, pages 223 - 229, XP004809314 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mee.2004.11.005