EP2019683 - ADMINISTRATION OF GROWTH FACTORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CNS DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2016/50] |
Former [2009/06] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANKIEWICZ, Krystof, S. 5815 Balmoral Drive Oakland, CA 94619 / US | [2009/06] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/31] |
Former [2016/50] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2009/06] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07761286.9 | 25.04.2007 | [2009/06] | WO2007US67423 | Priority number, date | US20060795012P | 25.04.2006 Original published format: US 795012 P | [2009/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007127803 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2019683 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2019683 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2019683 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K49/18, A61K33/24, A61K49/04, A61K51/12, A61K38/18, A61K48/00 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
A61K38/18 (EP,US);
A61K33/242 (EP,US);
A61K33/244 (EP,US);
A61K38/185 (EP,US);
A61K48/0083 (EP,US);
A61K49/0466 (EP,US);
A61K49/1812 (EP,US);
A61K51/1234 (US);
A61K9/0085 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K33/24, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/32] | A61K39/00, A61K38/18 | ||
Former IPC [2009/06] | A61K39/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2009/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERABREICHUNG VON WACHSTUMSFAKTOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ZNS-ERKRANKUNGEN | [2009/06] | English: | ADMINISTRATION OF GROWTH FACTORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CNS DISORDERS | [2009/06] | French: | ADMINISTRATION DE FACTEURS DE CROISSANCE POUR TRAITER DES TROUBLES DU SNC | [2009/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/06] | 08.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.11.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 04.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.09.2017
19.09.2017
ADMISSIBLE Herantis Pharma Oyj Bertel Jungin aukio 1 02600 Espoo / FI Opponent's representative Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2021/13] |
Former [2019/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.09.2017
19.09.2017
ADMISSIBLE Herantis Pharma Oyj Viikinkaari 4 00790 Helsinki / FI Opponent's representative Seppo Laine Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2017/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.09.2017
19.09.2017
ADMISSIBLE Herantis Pharma Oyj Viikinkaari 4 00790 Helsinki / FI Opponent's representative Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | 23.10.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.03.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.04.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.04.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.01.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.06.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 24.06.2019 | Appeal received No. T1910/19 | 23.08.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.01.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | 24.06.2019 | Appeal received No. T1910/19 | 22.08.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.12.2020 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2020/52] | 24.01.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | IS | 14.04.2017 | MT | 25.04.2017 | [2019/46] |
Former [2018/43] | EE | 14.12.2016 | |
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
MT | 25.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | EE | 14.12.2016 | |
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | EE | 14.12.2016 | |
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | LT | 14.12.2016 | |
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004075720 (NORTH BRISTOL N H S TRUST [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005120548 (STREATFIELD GILL STEVEN [GB]) [X] 1,2,11 * page 33, line 14 - page 34, line 14 * * page 38, line 16 - line 26 * * claim - *; | [XP]WO2006044115 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [XP] 1,2,6,11-15 * page 28; example 2; claim - *; | [X] - HAMILTON J F ET AL, "Heparin coinfusion during convection-enhanced delivery (CED) increases the distribution of the glial-derived neurotrophic factor (GDNF) ligand family in rat striatum and enhances the pharmacological activity of neurturin", EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1006/EXNR.2000.7571, (20010301), vol. 168, no. 1, ISSN 0014-4886, pages 155 - 161, XP002409643 [X] 1,2,4,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/exnr.2000.7571 | [X] - KIRIK DENIZ ET AL, "Localized striatal delivery of GDNF as a treatment for Parkinson disease", NATURE NEUROSCIENCE, NATURE AMERICA, INC, US LNKD- DOI:10.1038/NN1175, (20040201), vol. 7, no. 2, ISSN 1097-6256, pages 105 - 110, XP002343709 [X] 1,11-14 * the whole document * * page 108, column l * * page 109, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nn1175 | [A] - GILL S S ET AL, "Direct brain infusion of glial cell line-derived neurotrophic factor in Parkinson disease", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1038/NM850, (20030501), vol. 9, no. 5, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 589 - 595, XP002343708 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm850 | [A] - MASWOOD N ET AL, "Effects of chronic intraputamenal infusion of glial cell line-derived neurotrophic factor (GDNF) in aged Rhesus monkeys", NEUROBIOLOGY OF AGING, TARRYTOWN, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0197-4580(02)00022-2, (20020101), vol. 23, no. 5, ISSN 0197-4580, pages 881 - 889, XP002293324 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0197-4580(02)00022-2 | [A] - BRUNDIN PATRIK, "GDNF treatment in Parkinson's disease: Time for controlled clinical trials?", BRAIN, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, OXFORD, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1093/BRAIN/AWF217, (20021001), vol. 125, no. 10, ISSN 0006-8950, pages 2149 - 2151, XP002293327 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/brain/awf217 | [A] - SLEVIN JOHN T ET AL, "Improvement of bilateral motor functions in patients with Parkinson disease through the unilateral intraputaminal infusion of glial cell line-derived neurotrophic factor", JOURNAL OF NEUROSURGERY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS, US LNKD- DOI:10.3171/JNS.2005.102.2.0216, (20050201), vol. 102, no. 2, ISSN 0022-3085, pages 216 - 222, XP002427990 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3171/jns.2005.102.2.0216 | [A] - GRONDIN R ET AL, "CHRONIC, CONTROLLED GDNF INFUSION PROMOTES STRUCTURAL AND FUNCTIONAL RECOVERY IN ADVANCED PARKINSONIAN MONKEYS", BRAIN, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, OXFORD, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1093/BRAIN/AWF234, (20021001), vol. 125, no. PART 10, ISSN 0006-8950, pages 2191 - 2201, XP009035486 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/brain/awf234 | International search | [X]US2002114780 (BANKIEWICZ KRYS [US], et al) [X] 1 * , entire document. *; | [XE]US7371225 (OLDFIELD EDWARD H [US], et al) [XE] 2-5, 9, 10 and 15-25* , entire document. * | by applicant | US5720720 | US6042579 | US2002114780 | US2006073101 | - SAITO ET AL., EXP. NEUROL., (2005), vol. 196, pages 3891 - 389 | - KRAUZE ET AL., EXP. NEUROL., (2005), vol. 196, pages 104 - 111 | - KRAUZE ET AL., BRAIN RES. BRAIN RES. PROTOCOL., (2005), vol. 16, pages 20 - 26 | - CUNNINGHAM; WELLS, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - HADACZEK ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (2006), vol. 17, pages 1 - 12 | - SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 260, pages 1130 - 1132 | - KRIEGLSTEIN ET AL., EMBO J., (1995), vol. 14, pages 736 - 742 | - POULSEN ET AL., NEURON, (1994), vol. 13, pages 1245 - 1252 | - LIN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 260, pages 1130 - 1132 | - HUDSON ET AL., BRAIN RES. BULL, (1995), vol. 36, pages 425 - 432 | - BECK ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 373, pages 339 - 341 | - TOMAC ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 373, pages 335 - 339 | - HOFFER ET AL., NEUROSCI. LETT, (1994), vol. 182, pages 107 - 111 | - OPPENHEIM ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 373, pages 344 - 346 | - ZURN ET AL., NEUROREPORT, (1994), vol. 6, pages 113 - 118 | - YAN ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 373, pages 341 - 344 | - HENDERSON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 266, pages 1062 - 1064 | - SARIOLA ET AL., J. CELL SCI., (20031001), vol. 116, pages 3855 - 62 | - VENERO ET AL., NEUROREPORT, (1993), vol. 4, pages 959 - 962 | - HEFTI, J. NEUROBIOL, (1994), vol. 25, pages 1418 - 1435 | - OLSON, NEUROCHEM, (1994), pages 1 - 3 | - BATCHELOR ET AL., J. COMP. NEUROL., (1989), vol. 284, pages 187 - 204 | - KISS ET AL., NEUROSCI., (1988), vol. 27, pages 731 - 748 | - WOOLF ET AL., NEUROSCI, (1989), vol. 30, pages 143 - 152 | - SELKOE, NEURON, (1991), vol. 6, pages 487 - 498 | - PETTY ET AL., ANN. AUG, (1994), vol. 36, pages 244 - 246 | - ESLAMBOLI, REV. NEUROSCI, (2005), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 303 - 10 | - KORDOWER ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (1999), vol. 46, pages 419 - 424 | - GILL ET AL., NAT. MED., (2003), vol. 9, pages 5899 - 595 | - PATEL ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (2005), vol. 57, pages 298 - 302 | - LANG ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (2006), vol. 59, pages 459 - 466 | - ESLAMBOLI, REV. NEUROSCI., (2005), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 303 - 10 | - KRAUZE ET AL., EXP NEUROL., (200511), vol. 196, no. 1, pages 104 - 11 | Opposition | US2002114780 | - Christian WINKLER et al., "Short-Term GDNF Treatment Provides Long-Term Rescue of Lesioned Nigral Dopaminergic Neurons in a Rat Model of Parkinson's Disease", The Journal of Neuroscience, (19961115), vol. 16, no. 22, pages 7206 - 7215, XP055419561 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.16-22-07206.1996 | - LINDAHL et al., "Unconventional neurotrophic factors CDNF and MANF: Structure, physiological functions and therapeutic potential", Neurobiology of Disease, (20170000), vol. 97, pages 90 - 102, XP029839509 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nbd.2016.07.009 | - Christian WINKLER et al., "Short-Term GDNF Treatment Provides Long-Term Rescue of Lesioned Nigral Dopaminergic Neurons in a Rat Model of Parkinson's Disease", The Journal of Neuroscience, (19961115), vol. 16, no. 22, pages 7206 - 7215 | - LINDAHL et al., "Unconventional neurotrophic factors CDNF and MANF: Structure, physiological functions and therapeutic potential", Neurobiology of Disease, (20170000), vol. 97, pages 90 - 102 | - Bobo et al, 1994, PNAS 91:2076-80 | - Morrison et al, 1994, Am.J.Physiol. 266: R292-R305 | - Allard et al, 2009, Biomaterials 30: 2302-18 | - Schober, Cell Tissue Res., 2004, 318: 215-224 | - Grodin et al, 2002, Brain, 125: 2119-2201 | - Gill et al. 2003. Nature Medicine. 9(5): 589-95 | - Slevin et al, 2005, J Neurosurg 102: 216-22 | - Lang et al, 2006, Ann Neurol 59: 459-66 | - Patel and Gill, 2007, Acta Neurochir Suppl 97(2): 135-154 | - Morrison et al. 2007, J Neurosurg 107: 74-83 | - Salvatore et al, 2006, Exp Neurol 202: 497-505 | - Sherer et al, 2006, Movement Disorders 21(2): 136-41 | - Hadaczek et al, 2010, Neuropharmacology 58: 1114-21 | - Taylor et al, 2013, PLOS One 8(3):e56186, p. 1 -9 | - http://www.medlink.com/article/neurotrophic-factors | - Argente-Arizon et al, 2015, Fronteers in Endocrinology 6, article 42, p.1-15 | - PubMed abstract of Gold, 2000, Expert Opin Investig Drugs 9(10): 2331-42 | - McGeachie et al, 1997, Australian Dental Journal 42(6):375-80 | - Guo et al, 2001, Ann Neurol 50: 6-16 | - Poulter et al, 2004, Neuroscience 128: 1-6 | - Huttunen, H and M Saarma (2019) Cell transplantation 28(4):349-366 | - Mocchetti, I. (2005) Cell. Mol. Life Sci. 62:2283-94 | - Fusco, M. et al (1993) Ann. NY. Acad. Sci 695:314-7 | - Lim, S T et al (2011) Neuropharmacology 60:1160-7 |