Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024816

EP2024816 - MODE-BASED MULTIPLY-ADD PROCESSOR FOR DENORMAL OPERANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.02.2014
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.03.2014  [2014/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2013/24]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DOCKSER, Kenneth Alan c/o Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / LALL, Pathik Sunil
5617 Deblyn Avenue
Raleigh, NC 27612 / US
 [2009/12]
Former [2009/08]01 / DOCKSER, Kenneth Alan
1108 Walcott Way
Cary, NC 27519 / US
02 / LALL, Pathik Sunil
5617 Deblyn Avenue
Raleigh, NC 27612 / US
Representative(s)Heselberger, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Heselberger, Johannes
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date07761472.527.04.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US67649
Priority number, dateUS2006038252510.05.2006         Original published format: US 382525
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007133914
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024816
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F7/499, // G06F7/487, G06F7/544
[2013/14]
Former International [2009/08]G06F7/499, G06F7/487, G06F7/544
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:MULTIPLIKATIONSADDITIONSVORRICHTUNG (MULTIPLY-ADD) MIT MODUS FÜR DENORMALISIERTE OPERANDEN[2013/14]
English:MODE-BASED MULTIPLY-ADD PROCESSOR FOR DENORMAL OPERANDS[2009/08]
French:PROCESSEUR DE MULTIPLICATION-ADDITION BASÉ SUR MODE POUR OPÉRANDES DÉNORMALISÉS[2009/08]
Former [2009/08]MODUSBASIERENDER MULTIPLIZIER-ADDIER-PROZESSOR FÜR DENORMALE OPERANDEN
Entry into regional phase10.12.2008National basic fee paid 
10.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
12.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/13]
06.11.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/13]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.02.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
06.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2002194239  (PANGAL AMARESH [US]) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 7 * * page 2, paragraph 24 - paragraph 29 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 2-12,14-22;
 [X]GB2185338  (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * figures 2a,2b *;
 [A]US4727508  (WILLIAMS TIM A [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * column 8, line 38 - line 68 *;
 [A]EP0901067  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph 1 - column 3, paragraph 11 *
by applicantUS2002194239
 US4727508