Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020983

EP2020983 - AQUEOUS ANTISEPTIC SOLUTION AND COMPATIBLE CATIONIC DYE FOR STAINING SKIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.04.2012
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.04.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.05.2012  [2012/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CareFusion 2200, Inc.
3750 Torrey View Court
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
[2010/07]
Former [2010/04]For all designated states
Cardinal Health CMP 200, Inc
3750 Torrey View Court
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
Former [2010/01]For all designated states
Allegiance Corporation
1430 Waukegan Road McGaw Park
Illinois 60085 / US
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Enturia, Inc.
11400 Tomahawk Creek Parkway, Suite 310
Leawood, KS 66211 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MAGALLON, Angel, G.
1550 Northwestern Drive
El Paso, TX 79912 / US
02 / BOONE, Kyle, W.
1550 Northwestern Drive
El Paso, TX 79912 / US
03 / BARDWELL, James, R.
1550 Northwestern Drive
El Paso, TX 79912 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date07761685.201.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US67937
Priority number, dateUS2006038104701.05.2006         Original published format: US 381047
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007130981
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020983
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/02
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WÄSSRIGE ANTISEPTISCHE LÖSUNG UND KOMPATIBLER KATIONISCHER FARBSTOFF FÜR HAUTFÄRBUNG[2009/07]
English:AQUEOUS ANTISEPTIC SOLUTION AND COMPATIBLE CATIONIC DYE FOR STAINING SKIN[2009/07]
French:SOLUTION ANTISEPTIQUE AQUEUSE ET COLORANT CATIONIQUE COMPATIBLE DESTINÉS À COLORER LA PEAU[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2008National basic fee paid 
28.11.2008Search fee paid 
28.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
01.12.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/21]
10.01.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201105   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2005063926  (BATHINA HARINATH B [US], et al);
 [Y]US2003078242  (RAAD ISSAM [US], et al)