Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2019965

EP2019965 - DIFFERENTIAL DIAGNOSIS BETWEEN PULMONARY AND CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/06]DIAGNOSIS OF PULMONARY AND/OR CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE
[2014/40]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.02.2016
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 10.01.2018  [2018/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Critical Care Diagnostics, Inc.
140 West 57th, Suite 3B
New York, New York 10019 / US
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / SNIDER, James, V.
7893 Lafayette Court
Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US
02 / JACOBSON, Sven
800 6th Avenue, apt. 17b
New York, NY 10001 / US
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Williams, Gareth Owen , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/16]Fleck, Barbara
Marks & Clerk LLP
62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB
Former [2009/06]Fleck, Barbara
Marks & Clerk 62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB
Application number, filing date07761742.102.05.2007
[2009/06]
WO2007US68024
Priority number, dateUS20060797285P02.05.2006         Original published format: US 797285 P
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007131031
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2019965
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2019965
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.10.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/53, G01N33/543, C07K14/54, C07K14/58
[2009/50]
Former International [2009/06]G01N33/53, G01N33/543
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/16]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:DIFFERENTIALDIAGNOSE ZWISCHEN LUNGEN- UND HERZ-KREISLAUF-ERKRANKUNG[2014/40]
English:DIFFERENTIAL DIAGNOSIS BETWEEN PULMONARY AND CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE[2014/40]
French:DIAGNOSTIC DIFFÉERENTIEL ENTRE MALADIE PULMONAIRE ET LES MALADIES CARDIOVASCULAIRES[2014/40]
Former [2009/06]DIAGNOSE VON LUNGEN- UND/ODER HERZ-KREISLAUF-ERKRANKUNG
Former [2009/06]DIAGNOSIS OF PULMONARY AND/OR CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE
Former [2009/06]PROCEDES DE DIAGNOSTIC D'UNE MALADIE PULMONAIRE ET/OU CARDIOVASCULAIRE
Entry into regional phase28.11.2008National basic fee paid 
28.11.2008Search fee paid 
28.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
10.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2015Fee for grant paid
06.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15163587.7  / EP2995951
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.03.2010
Opposition(s)18.01.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG15.04.2015
CY15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MT15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
LU02.05.2015
IS15.08.2015
[2018/02]
Former [2017/39]BG15.04.2015
CY15.04.2015
CZ15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MT15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
IS15.08.2015
Former [2017/03]CZ15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
MT15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
IS15.08.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ15.04.2015
EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
RO15.04.2015
SK15.04.2015
IS15.08.2015
Former [2016/09]EE15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
IS15.08.2015
Former [2015/51]FI15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
IS15.08.2015
Former [2015/49]FI15.04.2015
LT15.04.2015
LV15.04.2015
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2004048286  (LEE RICHARD T [US]) [Y] 3,15 * paragraph [0263]; claim 12 *;
 [XY]  WEINBERG E O ET AL, "Identification of serum soluble ST2 receptor as a novel heart failure biomarker", CIRCULATION, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US, (20030201), vol. 107, no. 5, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 721 - 726, XP002985431 [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,11,13,14,16,18 * abstract * * page 722, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 724, column R, paragraph 2 * [Y] 3,6,8,10,12,15,19

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.0000047274.66749.FE
 [XY]  SHIMPO MASAHISA ET AL, "Serum levels of the interleukin-1 receptor family member ST2 predict mortality and clinical outcome in acute myocardial infarction", CIRCULATION, (20040511), vol. 109, no. 18, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 2186 - 2190, XP002552702 [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,11,13,14,16-18 * abstract * * page 2187, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 2190, column L, paragraph 3 * [Y] 19

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.0000127958.21003.5A
 [Y]  OSHIKAWA KATSUHISA ET AL, "Elevated soluble ST2 protein levels in sera of patients with asthma with an acute exacerbation", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY AND CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, (20010715), vol. 164, no. 2, ISSN 1073-449X, pages 277 - 281, XP002552703 [Y] 6,10,17 * page 280, column R, paragraph 4 *
 [Y]  CONKLIN B, "B-type Natriuretic Peptide: A New Measurement to Distinguish Cardiac From Pulmonary Causes of Acute Dyspnea", JOURNAL OF EMERGENCY NURSING, C.V. MOSBY, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (20050101), vol. 31, no. 1, ISSN 0099-1767, pages 73 - 75, XP004767729 [Y] 6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jen.2004.06.017
 [Y]  BAYÉS-GENÍS ANTONI, "[The circulating NTproBNP level, a new biomarker for the diagnosis of heart failure in patients with acute shortness of breath]", REVISTA ESPAÑOLA DE CARDIOLOGÍA OCT 2005, (200510), vol. 58, no. 10, ISSN 0300-8932, pages 1142 - 1144, XP002552704 [Y] 6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1885-5857(06)60391-5
 [Y]  PASCUAL FIGAL DOMINGO A ET AL, "[Usefulness of NTproBNP in the emergency management of patients with severe dyspnea and an uncertain heart failure diagnosis]", REVISTA ESPAÑOLA DE CARDIOLOGÍA OCT 2005, (200510), vol. 58, no. 10, ISSN 0300-8932, pages 1155 - 1161, XP002552705 [Y] 6 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1885-5857(06)60394-0
 [Y]  TUNG ET AL, "Amino-Terminal Pro-Brain Natriuretic Peptide for the Diagnosis of Acute Heart Failure in Patients With Previous Obstructive Airway Disease", ANNALS OF EMERGENCY MEDICINE, LANSING, MI, US, (20060220), vol. 48, no. 1, ISSN 0196-0644, pages 66 - 74, XP005505827 [Y] 6,10,12,17 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.annemergmed.2005.12.022
 [Y]  SCHMITZ J ET AL, "IL-33, an interleukin-1-like cytokine that signals via the IL-1 receptor-related protein ST2 and induces T helper type 2-associated cytokines", IMMUNITY, CELL PRESS, US, (20051101), vol. 23, no. 5, ISSN 1074-7613, pages 479 - 490, XP002432892 [Y] 8 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.immuni.2005.09.015
 [A]  TAJIMA SHUNJI ET AL, "The increase in serum soluble ST2 protein upon acute exacerbation of idiopathic pulmonary fibrosis.", CHEST, (200310), vol. 124, no. 4, ISSN 0012-3692, pages 1206 - 1214, XP002552706 [A] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1378/chest.124.4.1206
 [A]  JANUZZI JAMES L JR ET AL, "Utility of amino-terminal pro-brain natriuretic peptide testing for prediction of 1-year mortality in patients with dyspnea treated in the emergency department.", ARCHIVES OF INTERNAL MEDICINE 13 FEB 2006, (20060213), vol. 166, no. 3, ISSN 0003-9926, pages 315 - 320, XP008105037 [A] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archinte.166.3.315
 [A]  GEGENHUBER A ET AL, "B-type natriuretic peptide and amino terminal proBNP predict one-year mortality in short of breath patients independently of the baseline diagnosis of acute destabilized heart failure", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 370, no. 1-2, ISSN 0009-8981, (20060306), pages 174 - 179, (20060801), XP025058912 [A] 1-19 * available online 6 March 2006; page 178, column L, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cca.2006.02.010
 [A]  GOETZE J P ET AL, "B-type natriuretic peptide and its precursor in cardiac venous blood from failing hearts", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF HEART FAILURE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20050101), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 1388-9842, pages 69 - 74, XP004709133 [A] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejheart.2004.04.012
 [A]  MUELLER CHRISTIAN ET AL, "Use of B-type natriuretic peptide in the evaluation and management of acute dyspnea.", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20040212), vol. 350, no. 7, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 647 - 654, XP002552707 [A] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa031681
International search[X]US2005250156
ExaminationUS2004121343
    T. Socrates ET AL, "Interleukin family member ST2 and mortality in acute dyspnoea", Journal of Internal Medicine, (20100715), vol. 268, no. 5, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2796.2010.02263.x, ISSN 0954-6820, pages 493 - 500, XP055143605

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2796.2010.02263.x
    Domingo A. Pascual-Figal ET AL, "Soluble ST2, high-sensitivity troponin T- and N-terminal pro-B-type natriuretic peptide: complementary role for risk stratification in acutely decompensated heart failure", European Journal of Heart Failure, (20110701), vol. 13, no. 7, doi:10.1093/eurjhf/hfr047, ISSN 1388-9842, pages 718 - 725, XP055143607

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/eurjhf/hfr047
by applicant US2004121343