Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024000

EP2024000 - SINUS TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.10.2012
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.11.2012  [2012/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Entrigue Surgical, Inc.
12672 Silicon Drive, Suite 150
San Antonio, TX 78249 / US
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / GONZALES, Donald, Albert
12672 Silicon Dr., Ste.150
San Antonio, Tx 78249 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Dehmel, Albrecht
Dehmel & Bettenhausen
Patentanwälte PartmbB
Herzogspitalstrasse 11
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/27]Dehmel, Albrecht
Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 11
80331 München / DE
Former [2009/08]Dehmel, Albrecht
Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 11
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date07761881.704.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US68228
Priority number, dateUS20060802758P23.05.2006         Original published format: US 802758 P
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007140079
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2024000
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.11.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61M27/00, A61F2/04
[2011/46]
Former International [2009/08]A61M29/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SINUSRÖHRE[2009/08]
English:SINUS TUBE[2009/08]
French:TUBE À SINUS[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase16.12.2008National basic fee paid 
16.12.2008Search fee paid 
16.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
15.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/45]
20.06.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE3017065  (MESSINGSCHLAGER WALTER DR [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-11 * page 3, line 1 - page 3, line 31; figures 1-3; claims 1-4 * [I] 3,6;
 [XI]EP1415671  (POLYGANICS BV [NL]) [X] 1-11 * page 2, line 3 - page 2, line 5 * * page 3, line 11 - page 7, line 3; figures 1-3 * [I] 13-15;
 [I]US5139502  (BERG OLLE [SE], et al) [I] 1-7,10,11,13-15 * column 1, line 7 - column 3, line 66; figures 1-4; claims 1,2 *;
 [I]US4964850  (BOUTON VINCENT [FR], et al) [I] 1-7,10,12-15 * column 1, line 10 - column 3, line 4; figures 1-5 *;
 [I]DE10105592  (GOEPFERICH ACHIM [DE], et al) [I] 1-11 * column 5, paragraph 17 - column 9, paragraph 31; figures 1-7; claims 1-12 *;
 [X]US5775336  (MORRIS MICHAEL S [US]) [X] 1,12 * column 1, line 6 - column 1, line 11 * * column 2, line 14 - column 5, line 65; figures 1-10 *;
 [A]FR2598312  (BOUTON VINCENT [FR]) [A] 1-11,13-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 37; figures 1-6 *
International search[XY]US5807302  (WANDEL THADDEUS [US]) [X] 1-6, 11, 14, 20-23, 28, 29, 39, 40, 44-46 * , see entire document. * [Y] 7-10, 12, 13, 15-19, 24- 27, 30-37;
 [Y]US2003097151  (SMEDLEY GREGORY T [US], et al) [Y] 7-10, 15, 30-37 * , see entire document. *