Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021174

EP2021174 - AESTHETIC TRANSPARENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.05.2013
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.06.2013  [2013/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PPG Industries Ohio, Inc.
3800 West 143rd Street
Cleveland, OH 44111 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / THIEL, James P.
296 Mt. Royal Boulevard
Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15233 / US
02 / WINTER, John A.
106 North Jackson Avenue
Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15202 / US
03 / BELLI, Cheryl E.
749 Earl Avenue
New Kensington, Pennsylvania 15068 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)polypatent
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Polypatent
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date07761980.708.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US68417
Priority number, dateUS20060798828P09.05.2006         Original published format: US 798828 P
US20060855219P30.10.2006         Original published format: US 855219 P
US2007074503407.05.2007         Original published format: US 745034
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007134015
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021174
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:B32B15/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZIERFOLIE[2009/07]
English:AESTHETIC TRANSPARENCY[2009/07]
French:ÉLÉMENT TRANSPARENT ESTHÉTIQUE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2008National basic fee paid 
04.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
02.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/24]
22.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/24]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.07.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201206   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO02077081  (SOLUTIA INC [US]) [X] 1-32 * claims 1,12,18,25 *;
 [X]WO0114136  (GLAVERBEL [BE], et al) [X] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0980850  (LIBBEY OWENS FORD CO [US]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [DA]EP0691199  (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *