EP2025089 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR A KEYING MECHANISM FOR END-TO-END SERVICE CONTROL PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QI, Emily 8320 Nw Hawkins Blvd Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 02 /
WALKER, Jesse 10992 N.W. Appellate Way Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 03 /
TSAI, James 930 SW 163rd Avenue, 314 Beaverton, Oregon 97006 / US | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | HGF 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Clarke, Jeffrey Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07762129.0 | 11.05.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007US68763 | Priority number, date | US20060435316 | 15.05.2006 Original published format: US 435316 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007134227 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2025089 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, H04B7/26, H04L12/28 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
H04L63/062 (EP,US);
H04L9/083 (EP,US);
H04L9/321 (EP,US);
H04W12/0433 (EP,US);
H04L2209/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN SCHLÜSSELMECHANISMUS FÜR ENDE-ZU-ENDE-DIENSTESTEUERSCHUTZ | [2009/08] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR A KEYING MECHANISM FOR END-TO-END SERVICE CONTROL PROTECTION | [2009/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR LA GÉNÉRATION D'UN MÉCANISME DE MISE À LA CLÉ POUR LA PROTECTION DE CONTRÔLE DE SERVICES DE BOUT EN BOUT | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 10.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/19] | 04.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - N/A, "Peerkey Handshake Proposal ; 11-05-1264-00-000m-peerkey-handshake-proposal", IEEE DRAFT; 11-05-1264-00-000M-PEERKEY-HANDSHAKE-PROPOSAL, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20060106), vol. 802.11m, pages 1 - 19, XP017688109 [X] 1-15 * page 10 - page 16 * | [T] - JESSE WALKER (IEEE 802 LIAISON TO JTC1/SC6), "802.11i Overview ; 11-05-0123-01-0jtc-802-11i-overview", IEEE DRAFT; 11-05-0123-01-0JTC-802-11I-OVERVIEW, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20050224), vol. 802.11JTC AHC, no. 1, pages 1 - 108, XP017689600 [T] * page 1 - page 18 * | [T] - N/A, "11 05 0596 00 000s Snowmesh Doc ; 11-05-0596-01-000s-11-05-0596-00-000s-snowmesh-doc", IEEE DRAFT; 11-05-0596-01-000S-11-05-0596-00-000S-SNOWMESH-DOC, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20050621), vol. 802.11s, no. 1, pages 1 - 56, XP017688981 [T] * paragraph [0006] * | International search | [A]US2004185872 (EMMERSON FRANCIS [GB], et al); | [A]US2003235305 (HSU RAYMOND T [US]) | by applicant | - "Peerkey Handshake Proposal ; 11-05-1264-00-000m-peerkey-handshake-proposal", IEEE DRAFT; 11-05-1264-00-000M-PEERKEY-HANDSHAKE-PROPOSAL, IEEE-SA MENTOR, (20060106), vol. 802.11 m, pages 1 - 19 | - "802.11 i Overview; 11-05-0123-01 -0jtc-802-11 i-overview", JESSE WALKER, IEEE DRAFT, IEEE-SA MENTOR, (20050224), vol. 802, pages 1 - 108 | - "11 05 0596 00 000s Snowmesh Doc; 11 -05-0596-01 -OOOs-11-05-0596-00-000s-snowmesh-doc", IEEE DRAFT, IEEE-SA MENTOR, (20050621), vol. 802.11 s, pages 1 - 56 |