Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022228

EP2022228 - FREQUENCY HOPPING OF PILOT TONES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.04.2012
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.05.2012  [2012/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / INANOGLU, Hakan
12 Heather Hill Road
Acton, Massachusetts 01720 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date07762155.514.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US68842
Priority number, dateUS20060800677P15.05.2006         Original published format: US 800677 P
US2007074679510.05.2007         Original published format: US 746795
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007134273
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2022228
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04L27/26, H04B1/713, H04B17/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FREQUENZSPRUNG VON PILOTTÖNEN[2009/07]
English:FREQUENCY HOPPING OF PILOT TONES[2009/07]
French:SAUT DE FRÉQUENCE DE TONALITÉS PILOTES[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2008National basic fee paid 
11.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
17.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/22]
10.01.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/22]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.10.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201105   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2006013338  (GORE DHANANJAY A [US], et al) [X] 1-12,14-16,18-25,29-39 * figures 2A,3,4A,4B * * paragraphs [0025] , [0041] , [0049] , [0057] , [0062] , [0077] , [0082] , [0112] * [Y] 13,17,27,28,41;
 [XY]WO03077492  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 26,40,42 * figure 6; claim 1 * * page 1, lines 6-10 * * page 22, lines 15-19 * [Y] 13,17,27,28,41