Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022194

EP2022194 - WIRELESS ACCESS NETWORK AND METHOD FOR HANDOVER OF MOBILE TERMINALS IN IDLE MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2017/11]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Intel Corporation (INTEL)
2200 Mission College Blvd
Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VENKATACHALAM, Muthaiah
1441 NE Carlaby Way
Hillsboro, Oregon 97124 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
8th Floor
140 London Wall
London EC2Y 5DN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/11]Clarke, Jeffrey David
HGF Limited
140 London Wall
London EC2Y 5DN / GB
Former [2009/07]Clarke, Jeffrey
Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane
GB-London WC2A 1JA / GB
Application number, filing date07762212.416.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US69038
Priority number, dateUS2006041945519.05.2006         Original published format: US 419455
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007137069
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022194
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2022194
Date:15.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04W48/18, // H04W8/02, H04W8/26, H04W36/14, H04W88/18
[2016/42]
Former International [2012/49]H04B7/26, H04L12/66, H04W48/18
Former International [2009/07]H04B7/26, H04L12/66
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/11]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSES ZUGANGSNETZ UND VERFAHREN ZUM HANDOVER VON MOBILEN ENDGERÄTEN IM LEERLAUFBETRIEB[2009/07]
English:WIRELESS ACCESS NETWORK AND METHOD FOR HANDOVER OF MOBILE TERMINALS IN IDLE MODE[2009/07]
French:RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT INTERCELLULAIRE DE TERMINAUX MOBILES EN MODE VEILLE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2008National basic fee paid 
10.12.2008Search fee paid 
10.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
31.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2017Fee for grant paid
01.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.03.2014
Opposition(s)18.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
18.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
11.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
16.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
IE16.05.2017
LU16.05.2017
MT16.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/39]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
IE16.05.2017
LU16.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/23]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
IE16.05.2017
LU16.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/17]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
LU16.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/13]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/06]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2004185879  (KONG DONG-KEON [KR], et al) [X] 1-2,8-9,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0095] * * figures 3, 6, 7 * [I] 3-7,10-11,13-15;
 [A]EP1605724  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0037] *;
 [A]US2003103479  (ANDERSON JON J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0085] *
International search[A]KR100578653B  (PANTECH & CURITEL COMM INC [KR]);
 [A]US6647261  (BANERJEE DEBARAG NARAYAN [US]);
 [A]US2004067754  (GAO XIA [US], et al);
 [A]US6438370  (EINOLA HEIKKI [FI], et al)
by applicantUS2004185879