Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021048

EP2021048 - Automated peritoneal dialysis system driven by gravity and vacuum [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/07]AUTOMATED DIALYSIS SYSTEM DRIVEN BY GRAVITY AND VACUUM
[2017/39]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baxter International Inc.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxter Healthcare S.A.
Thurgauerstrasse 130
8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH
[2010/01]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Baxter International Inc.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxter Healthcare SA
Hertistrasse 2 Wallisellen
8304 Zurich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / CHILDERS, Robert
8816 Bel Meadow Way
Trinity, FL 34655 / US
02 / KEELING, Scott
2708 Ochatilla Road
Holiday, FL 34691 / US
03 / PAN, Li
10726 Tavistock Drive
Tampa, FL 33626 / US
 [2018/10]
Former [2009/07]01 / CHILDERS, Robert
8816 Bel Meadow Way
Trinity, Florida 34655 / US
02 / KEELING, Scott
2708 Ochatilla Road
Holiday, Florida 34691 / US
03 / PAN, Li
10726 Tavistock Drive
Tampa, Florida 33626 / US
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/10]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2013/37]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2009/07]Dee, Ian Mark
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date07762317.124.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US69642
Priority number, dateUS2006042060826.05.2006         Original published format: US 420608
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007140241
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021048
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021048
Date:07.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/28, A61M1/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/10]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Mittels Schwerkraft und Vakuum betriebenes automatisiertes Peritonealdialysesystem[2017/39]
English:Automated peritoneal dialysis system driven by gravity and vacuum[2017/39]
French:Système de dialyse péritonéale automatisé entraîné par la gravité et le vide[2017/39]
Former [2009/07]MITTELS SCHWERKRAFT UND VAKUUM BETRIEBENES AUTOMATISIERTES DIALYSESYSTEM
Former [2009/07]AUTOMATED DIALYSIS SYSTEM DRIVEN BY GRAVITY AND VACUUM
Former [2009/07]SYSTÈME DE DIALYSE AUTOMATISÉ ENTRAÎNÉ PAR LA GRAVITÉ ET LE VIDE
Entry into regional phase25.11.2008National basic fee paid 
25.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
17.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.2018Fee for grant paid
26.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.07.2015
Opposition(s)10.12.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
IE24.05.2018
LU24.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/19]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
IE24.05.2018
LU24.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/17]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
LU24.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/12]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/06]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/45]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/40]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/36]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
Former [2018/35]CY07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
Cited inInternational search[XY]US3730183  (GOLDSMITH H ET AL) [X] 1-4,8-10,13-20,22 * column 5, line 45 - column 7, line 14; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5-7,11,12,21,23-34;
 [Y]WO9520985  (GAMBRO AB [SE]; JEPPSSON JAN BERTIL [SE]; NORDLIE TOR [SE]) [Y] 5-7,11,12,21,23-34 * page 11, line 18 - page 13, line 24; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US2003218623  (KRENSKY ANDREA [US] ET AL) [A] 1-34 * paragraphs [0080] - [0094]; figure 1 *