Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1979865

EP1979865 - AUTHENTICATION AND VERIFICATION SERVICES FOR THIRD PARTY VENDORS USING MOBILE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.06.2009
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
19.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.
600-700 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US
[2013/13]
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US
Former [2008/42]For all designated states
Lucent Technologies Inc.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NANDAGOPAL, Thyagarajan
10 Heritage Drive
Edison, NJ 08820 / US
 [2008/42]
Representative(s)Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Wilhelmstraße 7
65185 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/51]Richardt Patentanwälte GbR
Wilhelmstraße 7
65185 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2009/49]Cockayne, Gillian
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2008/42]Cockayne, Gillian
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone, Innova Business Park Electric Avenue
GB-Enfield EN3 7XU / GB
Application number, filing date07763191.902.02.2007
[2008/42]
WO2007US02996
Priority number, dateUS2006034569502.02.2006         Original published format: US 345695
[2008/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007092366
Date:16.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1979865
Date:15.10.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007
[2008/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06Q20/00, G07F7/10
[2008/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/42]
TitleGerman:AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGS- UND VERIFIZIERUNGSDIENSTE FÜR DRITTVERKÄUFER MIT HILFE VON MOBILEN VORRICHTUNGEN[2008/42]
English:AUTHENTICATION AND VERIFICATION SERVICES FOR THIRD PARTY VENDORS USING MOBILE DEVICES[2008/42]
French:SERVICES D'AUTHENTIFICATION ET DE VÉRIFICATION POUR FOURNISSEURS INDÉPENDANTS UTILISANT DES DISPOSITIFS MOBILES[2008/42]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2008National basic fee paid 
31.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/42]
05.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2015Date of oral proceedings
03.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
03.07.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination21.08.2015Appeal received No.  T2271/15
30.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
01.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.02.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
21.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
20.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Executiondeleted
[2014/47]
Former [2013/40]ID:01
For:AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Date:10.04.2013
[2014/47]
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1443475  (SERVICIOS PARA MEDIOS DE PAGO [ES]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, paragraph 6 - column 4, paragraph 12 * * claim - *;
 [X]US2002059146  (KEECH WINSTON DONALD [GB]) [X] 1-10 * page 7, paragraph 76 - page 8, paragraph 86 * * figures 1,2 * * abstract *;
 [X]WO0155984  (FUNDAMO PROPRIETARY LTD [ZA], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 7, line 5 - line 25 * * page 9, line 26 - page 16, line 12 *;
 [X]FR2812424  (EVERBEE WIRELESS LTD [IL]) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 10 - page 8, line 40 *;
 [X]WO03015043  (HALTFERN LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1538571  (NAGRACARD SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 4, paragraph 31 - column 5, paragraph 36 * * figure 2 *