Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1984826

EP1984826 - METHOD, SYSTEM AND SOFTWARE PRODUCT FOR STREAMING CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.2015
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.03.2015  [2015/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vividas Technologies PTY LTD
157 High Steet
Prahran VIC 3138 / AU
[2008/44]
Inventor(s)01 / LIPKA, Martin
157 High Steet
Prahran, VIC 3181 / AU
02 / WINTER, David
157 High Steet
Prahran, VIC 3181 / AU
 [2008/44]
Representative(s)Towlson, Samantha Jayne , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/38]Gray, John James
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2008/44]Jones, Keith William
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date07763750.213.02.2007
[2008/44]
WO2007AU00193
Priority number, dateAU20060900685P13.02.2006         Original published format: AU 2006900685 P
[2008/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007115352
Date:18.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1984826
Date:29.10.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2007
[2008/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU18.10.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/14, H04L12/18, H04N1/21, H04N7/16
[2008/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/44]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND SOFTWARE FÜR STREAMING-CONTENT[2008/44]
English:METHOD, SYSTEM AND SOFTWARE PRODUCT FOR STREAMING CONTENT[2008/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET PRODUIT LOGICIEL POUR TRANSMISSION DE CONTENU EN CONTINU[2008/44]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2008National basic fee paid 
03.09.2008Search fee paid 
03.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
03.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/44]
16.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2013Date of oral proceedings
22.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
22.01.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
29.08.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/11]
08.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/11]
Appeal following examination27.03.2014Appeal received No.  T1424/14
02.06.2014Statement of grounds filed
19.12.2014Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.07.2011
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
09.05.2012Request for further processing filed
09.05.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.05.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201408   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US6970937  (HUNTINGTON DAN [US]) [I] 1-8,11-18,21-26 * abstract * * figures 2, 3 * * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 54 * * column 7, line 9 - column 8, line 15 *;
 [I]US2003097661  (LI HUA HARRY [US] ET AL) [I] 1,9-11,19,20 * figures 3, 5 * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0056] *;
 [I]US6405256  (LIN CHUENG-HSIEN [US] ET AL) [I] 1 * figures 1-3 * * column 6, line 42 - column 8, line 21 *;
 [A]US2004103208  (CHUNG RANDALL M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - HONG D ET AL, "A Transport Layer for Live Streaming in a Content Delivery Network", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/JPROC.2004.832956, (20040801), vol. 92, no. 9, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 1408 - 1419, XP011116498 [AD] 1-26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2004.832956
International search[X]US2002120675  ;
 [Y]US2005005000  ;
 [Y]US2003185297  ;
 [A]GB2398467  ;
 [A]US2002085713
by applicantUS6970937
 US2003097661
 US6405256