Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024690

EP2024690 - CONNECTION DEVICE FOR A HEATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, CH, LI, SI
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WILO SE
Nortkirchenstrasse 100
44263 Dortmund / DE
[2018/08]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
WILO AG
Nortkirchenstrasse 100
44263 Dortmund / DE
Inventor(s)01 / STRELOW, Günter
Kiefernweg 2
44801 Bochum / DE
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Cohausz, Helge B.
Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wißgott
Patentanwaltskanzlei GbR
Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[2018/09]
Former [2009/08]Cohausz, Helge B.
Cohausz Dawidowicz Hannig & Sozien Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date07764522.421.04.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007EP03513
Priority number, dateDE2006102408323.05.2006         Original published format: DE102006024083
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007134682
Date:29.11.2007
Language:DE
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024690
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2024690
Date:28.02.2018
Language:DE
[2018/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:F04D13/06, F04D29/60, F24D19/00
[2017/35]
Former International [2009/08]F24H9/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/09]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG FÜR HEIZKÖRPER[2009/08]
English:CONNECTION DEVICE FOR A HEATING APPARATUS[2009/08]
French:DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT POUR RADIATEUR[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase18.11.2008National basic fee paid 
18.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
24.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2018Fee for grant paid
12.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2015
Opposition(s)29.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
12.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
16.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
22.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
25.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
25.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
LU21.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
BG28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/08]CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
LU21.04.2018
BG28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/52]CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/51]CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/50]CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/43]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/40]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
Former [2018/35]CY28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004072564  (HUMMEL ANTON VERWALTUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-12,14,15,17 * pages 8,9,11; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]GB2407144  (F W OVENTROP GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3-13,15,17 * abstract *;
 [X]DE20305054U  (KRONEMEYER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7-10,15,16 * abstract *;
 [PX]EP1701110  (ARBONIA AG [CH]) [PX] 1,5-12,14-16 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011]; figures 1,4,5 *;
 [A]DE20218913U  (LEIS ERICH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *