EP2026858 - DEVICE FOR USE IN AN ARRANGEMENT FOR MONITORING AN ACCESS TO A PATIENT, AND METHOD FOR MONITORING A PATIENT ACCESS, IN PARTICULAR A VASCULAR ACCESS IN EXTRACORPOREAL BLOOD TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg v.d.H. / DE | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEINEKOFORT, Wolfgang Feldbergstrasse 16b 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 02 /
JONAS, Jörg Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 3a 61273 Wehrheim / DE | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Oppermann, Frank, et al OANDO Oppermann & Oppermann Wilhelminenstrasse 1a 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Oppermann, Frank, et al Oppermann & Oppermann LLP John-F.-Kennedy-Straße 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2009/09] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 07764574.5 | 06.06.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007EP04994 | Priority number, date | DE20061027054 | 10.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006027054 | [2009/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007140994 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2026858 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36, A61M5/14, A61M25/02 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
A61M25/02 (EP,US);
A61M1/3653 (EP,US);
A61M1/3656 (EP,US);
A61M1/3659 (EP,US);
A61M5/16831 (EP,US);
A61M2025/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE EINRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES ZUGANGS ZU EINEM PATIENTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES PATIENTENZUGANGS, INSBESONDERE EINES GEFÄßZUGANGS BEI EINER EXTRAKORPORALEN BLUTBEHANDLUNG | [2009/09] | English: | DEVICE FOR USE IN AN ARRANGEMENT FOR MONITORING AN ACCESS TO A PATIENT, AND METHOD FOR MONITORING A PATIENT ACCESS, IN PARTICULAR A VASCULAR ACCESS IN EXTRACORPOREAL BLOOD TREATMENT | [2009/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR UN SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE L'ABORD D'UN PATIENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE L'ABORD D'UN PATIENT, EN PARTICULIER D'UN ABORD VASCULAIRE DANS UN TRAITEMENT SANGUIN EXTRACORPOREL | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/41] | 05.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3640275 (BURKE GEORGE K, et al) [Y] 8-11 * column 2, lines 9-50; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]WO9924145 (AKSYS LTD [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 9, line 16 - page 10, line 7; figures 1,6 * [Y] 8-13; | [Y]EP0995451 (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 12,13* paragraphs [0020] - [0033]; figure 2 *; | [X]DE19959965 (SIEMENS MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 2, lines 1-43; figures 1A,1B,2A,2B *; | [X]EP1060757 (SEACREST TECHNOLOGY LTD [IE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *; | [PX]DE102006011313 (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-4 * paragraphs [0014] , [0020] , [0021]; figures 5,6 * | Examination | US6506182 | by applicant | WO9924145 | DE19959965 | EP1060757 | WO02072179 | US2004186415 |