blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2027386 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2027386



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 156
10.02.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
29.06.2011 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.07.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.07.2010 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
08.07.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.07.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
09.04.2010 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
08.04.2010 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
31.03.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
31.03.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
31.03.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
31.03.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
28.01.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.01.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
30.12.2008 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
30.12.2008 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
12.11.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
24.10.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
08.07.2008 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
19.05.2008 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
19.05.2008 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.05.2008 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.05.2008 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
19.05.2008 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
19.05.2008 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
19.05.2008 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
19.05.2008 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.05.2008 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.05.2008 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.05.2008 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.04.2008 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
11.04.2008 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
10.04.2008 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
10.04.2008 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
10.04.2008 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
10.01.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
21.12.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
21.12.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
21.12.2007 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 16
23.07.2007 Urgent incoming letter to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
12.06.2007 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
12.06.2007 Claims PCT receiving Office 4
12.06.2007 Description PCT receiving Office 9
12.06.2007 Drawings PCT receiving Office 2