blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2027386


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.11.2013  [2013/45]
27.09.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.10.2013  [2013/44]
30.12.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.02.2012  [2012/05]
22.07.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.08.2011  [2011/34]
01.07.2011 No opposition filed within time limit published on  03.08.2011  [2011/31]
17.06.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.07.2011  [2011/29]
10.06.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2011  [2011/28]
03.06.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.07.2011  [2011/27]
23.07.2010 (Expected) grant published on  25.08.2010  [2010/34]
17.07.2010 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
17.07.2010 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
02.07.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.04.2010 Change - designated states published on  19.05.2010  [2010/20]
19.03.2010 Change - extension states published on  21.04.2010  [2010/16]
18.03.2010 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.06.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.01.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.02.2009  [2009/09]
23.01.2009 Request for examination filed published on  25.02.2009  [2009/09]
04.12.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
21.11.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
02.05.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
29.02.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
26.12.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
21.08.2007 PCT data prior to European publication