blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2027386
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5189087BGlobal Dossier 24.04.2013B2
JP2009540203 19.11.2009A
Priority number Date
WO2007EP05121 11.06.2007
DE102006027614 13.06.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2027386Global Dossier 25.08.2010B1
EP2027386 25.02.2009A1
Priority number Date
WO2007EP05121 11.06.2007
DE102006027614 13.06.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT479019T 15.09.2010T
Priority number Date
WO2007EP05121 11.06.2007
DE102006027614 13.06.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2007144122Global Dossier 21.12.2007A1
Priority number Date
DE102006027614 13.06.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20090018929Global Dossier 24.02.2009A
Priority number Date
DE102006027614 13.06.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102006027614 05.02.2009B4
DE102006027614 27.12.2007A1
Priority number Date
DE102006027614 13.06.2006