Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027386

EP2027386 - INJECTOR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.2011
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Orange GmbH
Porschestrasse 30
70435 Stuttgart / DE
[2010/34]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
L'Orange Gmbh
Porschestrasse 30
70435 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KOCH, Hans-Joachim
Schopflocherstrasse 22
72293 Glatten / DE
02 / SCHEIBE, Wolfgang
Odenheimstrasse 11
71642 Ludwigsburg-Poppenweiler / DE
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Winter, Josef
Tognum AG
CL-P Schutzrechte
Maybachplatz 1
88045 Friedrichshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Winter, Josef
Tognum AG VL-P Schutzrechte Maybachplatz 1
88045 Friedrichshafen / DE
Application number, filing date07764607.311.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007EP05121
Priority number, dateDE2006102761413.06.2006         Original published format: DE102006027614
[2009/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007144122
Date:21.12.2007
Language:DE
[2007/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027386
Date:25.02.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2027386
Date:25.08.2010
Language:DE
[2010/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:F02M61/16
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/20]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINSPRITZINJEKTOR FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN[2009/09]
English:INJECTOR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES[2009/09]
French:INJECTEUR POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase12.11.2008National basic fee paid 
12.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.04.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
31.03.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.2010Fee for grant paid
08.07.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
HU25.08.2010
IE25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
LV25.08.2010
MT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
PL25.08.2010
RO25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
TR25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
GR26.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]CY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
IE25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
LV25.08.2010
MT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
PL25.08.2010
RO25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
TR25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
GR26.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
Former [2012/05]CY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
IE25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
LV25.08.2010
MT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
PL25.08.2010
RO25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
GR26.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
Former [2011/29]CY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
IE25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
LV25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
PL25.08.2010
RO25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
GR26.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
Former [2011/27]CY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
IE25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
LV25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
PL25.08.2010
RO25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
GR26.11.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19752834  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,15 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 41; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US2376292  (TABB WARNER T, et al) [X] 1-7,15-17 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 14; figures 1,4,6 *;
 [A]JPH08218974  (KEIHIN SEIKI MFG) [A] 1-3,8,19 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2006018440  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,15 * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 8; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO02068816  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,15 * abstract *;
 [A]GB429405  (VICKERS ARMSTRONGS LTD, et al) [A] 1,2,15,16,18 * page 2, line 79 - line 101; figures 1,2 *