Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2044325

EP2044325 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A WIND ENERGY INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.08.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Senvion GmbH
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
[2015/36]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Senvion SE
Überseering 10 (Oval Office)
22297 Hamburg / DE
Former [2012/39]For all designated states
REpower Systems SE
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Former [2009/15]For all designated states
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WEITKAMP, Roland
Östringer Weg 38
49090 Osnabrück / DE
 [2011/34]
Former [2009/15]01 / WEITKAMP, Roland
Hinter dem Felde 30
49191 Belm / DE
Representative(s)Seemann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Raboisen 6
20095 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/40]Grebner, Christian Georg Rudolf
Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Ballindamm 3
20095 Hamburg / DE
Former [2009/15]Grebner, Christian Georg Rudolf
Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Ballindamm 3
20095 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date07765077.805.07.2007
[2009/15]
WO2007EP05956
Priority number, dateDE2006103425121.07.2006         Original published format: DE102006034251
[2009/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008009354
Date:24.01.2008
Language:DE
[2008/04]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2044325
Date:08.04.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008
[2009/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2044325
Date:03.10.2012
Language:DE
[2012/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:F03D7/00, F03D7/04, F03D11/00
[2009/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER WINDENERGIEANLAGE[2009/15]
English:METHOD FOR OPERATING A WIND ENERGY INSTALLATION[2009/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE ÉOLIENNE[2009/15]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2008National basic fee paid 
11.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/15]
09.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.04.2012
24.04.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
08.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2012Fee for grant paid
12.07.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.04.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.07.2013  09.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [2017/48]
Former [2013/32]
Opponent(s)01  01.07.2013   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
26.08.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.12.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.07.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition17.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1898/16
11.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
19.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1898/16
03.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
31.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
07.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
07.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.07.2007
CY03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
IT03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
MC03.10.2012
MT03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
RO03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
TR03.10.2012
BG03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
AT05.07.2013
IE05.07.2013
LU05.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
IT03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
MC03.10.2012
MT03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
RO03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
TR03.10.2012
BG03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
AT05.07.2013
IE05.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/51]CY03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
IT03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
MC03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
RO03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
BG03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
AT05.07.2013
IE05.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/33]CY03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
IT03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
MC03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
RO03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
BG03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
IE05.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/23]CY03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
IT03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
MC03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
RO03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
BG03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
BE31.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/20]CY03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
IT03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
MC03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
RO03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
BG03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/14]CY03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
IT03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
MC03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
RO03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
BG03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
Former [2013/37]CY03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
IT03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
RO03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
BG03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
Former [2013/35]CY03.10.2012
CZ03.10.2012
EE03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
SK03.10.2012
BG03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
Former [2013/34]CY03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
BG03.01.2013
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
Former [2013/28]CY03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
PT04.02.2013
Former [2013/24]CY03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
GR04.01.2013
IS03.02.2013
Former [2013/23]CY03.10.2012
FI03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
LV03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
PL03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
IS03.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI03.10.2012
LT03.10.2012
NL03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
IS03.02.2013
Former [2013/21]LT03.10.2012
SE03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
Former [2013/20]LT03.10.2012
SI03.10.2012
Former [2013/11]SI03.10.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19948194  (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2005107989  (HENRIKSEN ULRIK H [DK], et al) [X] 1-30 * abstract *;
 [X]WO9007823  (ELIN ENERGIEVERSORGUNG [AT]) [X] 1-30 * abstract *;
 [X]US2004236538  (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE20021970U  (IGUS INGENIEURGEMEINSCHAFT UMW [DE]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5278773  (COUSINEAU KEVIN L [US]) [X] 1-30 * abstract *;
 [DA]WO02079646  (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [DA] 1-30 * the whole document *
by applicantDE202005014629U
 DE10115267
 DE19948194
 US2004236538
 US2005107989
 WO9007823
 DE20021970U
 US5278773