Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027628

EP2027628 - AN ULTRA WIDEBAND ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.08.2011
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.09.2011  [2011/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thales Holdings UK Plc
2 Dashwood Lang Road The Bourne Business Park NR Weybridge
Addlestone, Surrey KT15 2NX / GB
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / CHUA, Lye Whatt
High Beeches Green Dene
East Horsley Surrey KT24 5RD / GB
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Esselin, Sophie , et al
Marks & Clerk France
Conseils en Propriété Industrielle
Immeuble Visium
22 avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Esselin, Sophie , et al
Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date07765399.613.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007EP55842
Priority number, dateGB2006001167313.06.2006         Original published format: GB 0611673
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007144382
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027628
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2027628
Date:13.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01Q9/04, H01P3/08
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2009/28]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ULTRABREITBANDANTENNE[2009/09]
English:AN ULTRA WIDEBAND ANTENNA[2009/09]
French:ANTENNE À BANDE ULTRALARGE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase14.11.2008National basic fee paid 
14.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
14.01.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
17.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2010Fee for grant paid
03.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.07.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP1517401  (THALES PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-8,11-13,16-20,23-30,33-35,38-41,44,45 * abstract * * column 16, paragraphs 83-87 * * column 18, paragraph 95 *;
 [Y]WO03103087  (SKYCROSS INC [US]) [Y] 1-8,11-13,16-20,23-30,33-35,38-41,44,45 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 8 * * page 7, paragraph 29 - page 8, paragraph 36 * * page 11, paragraph 45 * * page 12, paragraph 49 *;
 [A]WO2004001894  (FRACTUS SA [ES], et al) [A] 9,10,14,15,31,32,36,37 * abstract * * page 11, line 26 - page 12, line 6 *;
 [A]US2006061513  (SATO MASARU [JP]) [A] 21,22,42,43 * abstract * * page 3, paragraphs 44-49 * * page 4, paragraphs 68,69 *;
 [A]WO9820578  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 21,22,41-43 * abstract *