Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2035821

EP2035821 - Use of an apparatus in a production facility for biogas and method for the ultrasonic determination of the concentrations of components in a biogas mixture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/12]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE ULTRASONIC DETERMINATION OF THE CONCENTRATIONS OF COMPONENTS IN A GAS MIXTURE
[2014/08]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.01.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
30.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Endress + Hauser Flowtec AG
Kägenstrasse 7
4153 Reinach / CH
[2009/12]
Inventor(s)01 / JACOBSON, Saul
403 Huon Road
South Hobart TAS 7004 / AU
 [2009/15]
Former [2009/12]01 / JACOBSEN, Saul
Alemannengasse 62
CH-4058 Basel / CH
Representative(s)Andres, Angelika Maria
Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG
PatServe
Colmarer Strasse 6
79576 Weil am Rhein / DE
[2014/35]
Former [2009/12]Andres, Angelika Maria
Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6
79576 Weil am Rhein / DE
Application number, filing date07765679.127.06.2007
[2009/12]
WO2007EP56439
Priority number, dateDE2006103096403.07.2006         Original published format: DE102006030964
[2009/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008003627
Date:10.01.2008
Language:DE
[2008/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2035821
Date:18.03.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2008
[2009/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2035821
Date:27.08.2014
Language:DE
[2014/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01N29/024, G01N29/32, G01F1/66
[2009/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/12]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verwendung einer Vorrichtung in einer Anlage zur Erzeugung von Biogas und Verfahren zur Ultraschallbestimmung der Konzentrationen von Komponenten eines Biogasgemisches[2014/13]
English:Use of an apparatus in a production facility for biogas and method for the ultrasonic determination of the concentrations of components in a biogas mixture[2014/13]
French:Utilisation d'un dispositif dans usine de production de biogas et procédé de détermination ultrasonore des concentrations de constituants d'un mélange gazeux de biogaz.[2014/13]
Former [2009/12]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ULTRASCHALLBESTIMMUNG DER KONZENTRATIONEN VON KOMPONENTEN EINES GASGEMISCHES
Former [2009/12]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE ULTRASONIC DETERMINATION OF THE CONCENTRATIONS OF COMPONENTS IN A GAS MIXTURE
Former [2009/12]DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION ULTRASONIQUE DES CONCENTRATIONS DE CONSTITUANTS D'UN MÉLANGE GAZEUX
Entry into regional phase12.12.2008National basic fee paid 
12.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/12]
29.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
24.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2014Fee for grant paid
16.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.04.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.05.2015   
KROHNE Messtechnik GmbH
Ludwig-Krohne-Strasse 5
47058 Duisburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Schmidt, Oliver Jürgen
GESTHUYSEN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 10 13 54
45128 Essen / DE
 [2015/27]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
03.07.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.01.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
02.01.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.01.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition06.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0584/17
06.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
10.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
25.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.06.2007
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
MT27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
TR27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
AT27.06.2015
IE27.06.2015
LU27.06.2015
BE30.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2017/03]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
MT27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
AT27.06.2015
IE27.06.2015
LU27.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2016/50]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
AT27.06.2015
IE27.06.2015
LU27.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2016/22]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
IE27.06.2015
LU27.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2016/20]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
IE27.06.2015
LU27.06.2015
Former [2016/11]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
LU27.06.2015
Former [2016/09]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/50]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/24]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/23]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/22]CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
Former [2015/08]LT27.08.2014
Cited inInternational search[XY]JP2004325297  (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1-8,13,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] * [Y] 9-12;
 [X]WO0108554  (HEALTHETECH INC [US]) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * page 2, line 10 - page 16, line 18 * * page 20, line 1 - page 26, line 14 *;
 [Y]US2004195531  (RAHMOUNI CAMAL [FR], et al) [Y] 9-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0143] *;
 [DA]US5392635  (CADET GARDY [US], et al) [DA] 1,13 * abstract * * column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 32 *
by applicantJP2004325297
 WO0108554
 US5392635
 EP0686255
 US4484478
 DE4336369
 DE29803911U
 DE4336370
 US4598593
    - Handbuch