Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024798

EP2024798 - SECURE TERMINAL CONFIGURATION METHOD AND DEVICE BY MEANS OF A BOOT DATA STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.08.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI, SI
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orange
78, rue Olivier de Serres
75015 Paris / FR
[2018/02]
Former [2013/39]For all designated states
Orange
78, rue Olivier de Serres
75015 Paris / FR
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
FRANCE TELECOM
6 Place d'Alleray
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / CHARLES, Olivier
218, Avenue Jean Jaurès
92140 Clamart / FR
02 / LECLERCQ, Eric
35, rue de la Vanne
1000 Bruxelles / BE
03 / MAUPETIT, Matthieu
14, Rue Nelaton
75015 Paris / FR
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[2018/02]
Application number, filing date07766044.714.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007FR51268
Priority number, dateFR2006005173315.05.2006         Original published format: FR 0651733
[2009/08]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007132122
Date:22.11.2007
Language:FR
[2007/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024798
Date:18.02.2009
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2024798
Date:10.01.2018
Language:FR
[2018/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/57
[2017/12]
Former International [2009/08]G06F1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/02]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GESICHERTEN KONFIGURATION EINES ENDGERÄTS MITTELS EINER SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG FÜR BOOT-DATEN[2009/08]
English:SECURE TERMINAL CONFIGURATION METHOD AND DEVICE BY MEANS OF A BOOT DATA STORAGE DEVICE[2009/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CONFIGURATION SÉCURISÉE D'UN TERMINAL AU MOYEN D'UN DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE DE DONNÉES DE DÉMARRAGE[2017/35]
Former [2009/08]PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CONFIGURATION SECURISEE D'UN TERMINAL AU MOYEN D'UN DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE DE DONNEES DE DEMARRAGE
Entry into regional phase12.12.2008National basic fee paid 
12.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
12.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
04.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2017Fee for grant paid
29.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.05.2009
Opposition(s)11.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
26.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
24.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/06]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/43]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/38]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
GR11.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
Former [2018/35]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
Former [2018/34]FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9317388  (CLARK PAUL C [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 5 * * page 3, line 5 - page 5, line 14 * * page 9, line 11 - page 10, line 31 * * page 11, line 26 - page 13, line 4 * * page 15, line 31 - page 16, line 18 * * page 17, line 4 - page 20, line 15 * * page 22, line 1 - page 23, line 17 * * figures 1,2,4,6-10 *;
 [X]WO0142889  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * abstract * * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 20 * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 13 * * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 19 * * page 13, line 17 - page 15, line 9 * * figures 1A,1B,2,4 *;
 [X]US2005138414  (ZIMMER VINCENT J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9,10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 12 - paragraph 14 * * page 2, paragraphs 17,21 * * page 2, paragraph 25 - page 3, paragraph 25 * * page 3, paragraphs 26,30,32 * * page 4, paragraph 44 * * claims 1,6,8,11,15,16 * * figures 2-5 *;
 [A]WO03009115  (CODEX TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 9 - paragraph 12 * * page 3, paragraph 16 - paragraph 17 * * page 5, paragraph 53 * * page 17, paragraph 180 - page 19, paragraph 206 * * page 20, paragraph 213 - page 23, paragraph 238 * * page 28, paragraph 293 - page 29, paragraph 295 * * page 36, paragraph 379 * * figures 2,3A,6 *