Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022116

EP2022116 - TEXTILE ELECTRODE AND ACCUMULATOR CONTAINING SUCH AN ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.06.2011
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Electricité de France
22-30 avenue de Wagram
75008 Paris / FR
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / VIDAL, Elodie
54 rue Orgiazzi
F-77690 Montigny Sur Loing / FR
02 / LASCAUD, Stéphane
1 rue Béranger
F-77300 Fontainebleau / FR
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date07766073.618.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007FR51299
Priority number, dateFR2006000469324.05.2006         Original published format: FR 0604693
[2009/07]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007135331
Date:29.11.2007
Language:FR
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022116
Date:11.02.2009
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2022116
Date:04.08.2010
Language:FR
[2010/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/02, H01M4/74
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TEXTILELEKTRODE UND AKKUMULATOR MIT EINER SOLCHEN ELEKTRODE[2009/07]
English:TEXTILE ELECTRODE AND ACCUMULATOR CONTAINING SUCH AN ELECTRODE[2009/07]
French:ELECTRODE TEXTILE ET ACCUMULATEUR CONTENANT UNE TELLE ELECTRODE.[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase13.11.2008National basic fee paid 
13.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
12.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2010Fee for grant paid
01.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.08.2010
CZ04.08.2010
EE04.08.2010
FI04.08.2010
HU04.08.2010
IE04.08.2010
LT04.08.2010
LV04.08.2010
MT04.08.2010
NL04.08.2010
PL04.08.2010
RO04.08.2010
SI04.08.2010
SK04.08.2010
TR04.08.2010
BG04.11.2010
GR05.11.2010
IS04.12.2010
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]CY04.08.2010
CZ04.08.2010
EE04.08.2010
FI04.08.2010
IE04.08.2010
LT04.08.2010
LV04.08.2010
MT04.08.2010
NL04.08.2010
PL04.08.2010
RO04.08.2010
SI04.08.2010
SK04.08.2010
TR04.08.2010
BG04.11.2010
GR05.11.2010
IS04.12.2010
Former [2012/05]CY04.08.2010
CZ04.08.2010
EE04.08.2010
FI04.08.2010
IE04.08.2010
LT04.08.2010
LV04.08.2010
MT04.08.2010
NL04.08.2010
PL04.08.2010
RO04.08.2010
SI04.08.2010
SK04.08.2010
BG04.11.2010
GR05.11.2010
IS04.12.2010
Former [2011/26]CY04.08.2010
CZ04.08.2010
EE04.08.2010
FI04.08.2010
IE04.08.2010
LT04.08.2010
LV04.08.2010
NL04.08.2010
PL04.08.2010
RO04.08.2010
SI04.08.2010
SK04.08.2010
BG04.11.2010
GR05.11.2010
IS04.12.2010
Cited inInternational search[DY]FR2870639  (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]) [DY] 1-13,18-20 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0717457  (KATAYAMA TOKUSHU KOGYO KK [JP]) [Y] 1-13,18-20 * column 1, line 7 - line 18 * * column 4, line 46 - line 55 * * column 5, line 38 - line 50 * * column 6, line 3 - line 9 * * column 6, line 21 - line 31 * * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 4 * * column 7, line 29 - line 41 * * column 8, line 39 - line 53 * * column 9, line 19 - line 24 * * column 33, line 29 - column 36, line 10 *;
 [Y]FR2762142  (LEICHLE GUY [FR]) [Y] 1,2,4-12,18-20 * page 1, line 8 - page 2, line 15 * * page 3, line 19 - line 21 * * page 4, line 1 - line 5 * * claims 1-3,18 *;
 [Y]JPH01239770  (HITACHI MAXELL) [Y] 1,2,4-12,18-20 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0936687  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]KR20030060165  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS62198055  (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9417224  (OLIN CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 1, line 1 - line 11 * * page 5, paragraph 12 - page 6, paragraph 23 * * examples 1-3 *