Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024151

EP2024151 - USE OF A MATERIAL RESISTANT TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF MICROORGANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.09.2011
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2011Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 12.10.2011  [2011/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lapeyre
18, Avenue d'Alsace
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / EL KASMI, Silham
3 bis Rue des Moissons
51460 L'Epine / FR
02 / PEYDECASTAING, Jérôme
67, Rue André Vasseur
F- 31200 Toulouse / FR
03 / VACA-GARCIA, Carlos
5 impasse des Clarines, Apt 115
F- 31400 Toulouse / FR
 [2009/16]
Former [2009/08]01 / EL KASMI, Silham
3 bis Rue des Moissons
51460 L'Epine / FR
02 / PEYDECASTAING, Jérôme
67, Rue André Vasseur
F- 31200 Toulouse / FR
03 / VACA-GARCIA, Carlos
134, Avenue Jean Rieux, Bât. A
F- 31500 Toulouse / FR
Representative(s)Colombier, Christian
Saint-Gobain Recherche
39, quai Lucien Lefranc
93300 Aubervilliers / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Colombier, Christian
Département Propriété Industrielle SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc
93300 Aubervilliers / FR
Application number, filing date07766122.130.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007FR51355
Priority number, dateFR2006005201705.06.2006         Original published format: FR 0652017
[2009/08]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007141445
Date:13.12.2007
Language:FR
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024151
Date:18.02.2009
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:B27K3/34
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINES GEGEN DIE ENTWICKLUNG VON MIKROORGANISMEN RESISTENTEN MATERIALS[2009/08]
English:USE OF A MATERIAL RESISTANT TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF MICROORGANISMS[2009/08]
French:UTILISATION D'UN MATÉRIAU RÉSISTANT AU DÉVELOPPEMENT DES MICRO-ORGANISMES[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase13.11.2008National basic fee paid 
13.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
11.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.09.2011Application withdrawn by applicant  [2011/41]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.12.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
06.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO03049913  (ORGANISATION NATIONALE INTERPR [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 8; example - *;
 [Y]FR2838369  (LAPEYRE [FR]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH04259506
 [Y]  - DAWSON ET AL, "Reactivity of radiata pine sapwood towards carboxylic acid anhydrides", CHEMABS, (1999), XP002153747 [Y] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PAPADOPOULOS A.N., HILL C.A.S., "The biological effectiveness of wood modified with linear chain carboxylic acid anhydrides against", HOLZ ALS ROH- UND WERKSTOFF, (20021009), vol. 60, no. 5, pages 329 - 332, XP002416828 [A] 1,2 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00107-002-0327-8
 [A]  - IWAMOTO Y., ITOH T., "Vapor phase reaction of wood with maleic anhydride (I): dimensional stability and durability of treated wood", JOURNAL OF WOOD SCIENCE, (20051202), vol. 51, no. 6, pages 595 - 600, XP002416829 [A] 1,2 * paragraphe "introduction", page 595 paragraphe "fungal decay tests", page 597 *
 [A]  - HILL C A S ET AL, "An investigation of cell wall micropore blocking as a possible mechanism for the decay resistance of anhydride modified wood", INTERNATIONAL BIODETERIORATION AND BIODEGRADATION, OXFORD, GB, (200501), vol. 55, no. 1, ISSN 0964-8305, pages 69 - 76, XP004720129 [A] 1,2 * Paragraphe "1. Introduction", page 69 Paragraphe "2.1. Anhydride modification", pages 70-71 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ibiod.2004.07.003
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 44, Database accession no. 1992-360025, XP002416832 & JPH04259506 A 19920916 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract *