Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2051770

EP2051770 - FLUID CONNECTOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.04.2014
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Young, Peter Jeffrey
The Old Parsonage Church Lane Roydon King's Lynn
Norfolk PE32 1AR / GB
[2013/25]
Former [2009/18]For all designated states
Young, Peter Jeffrey
The Old Parsonage Church Lane Roydon King's Lynn
Norfolk PE32 1AR / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/18]
Representative(s)Gibson, Mark , et al
Sagittarius IP
Marlow International
Parkway
Marlow SL7 1YL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]Gibson, Mark , et al
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
Former [2013/07]Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
Former [2011/38]Gibson, Mark , et al
Sagittarius IP Taylor House 39 High Street
Marlow, Bucks SL7 1AF / GB
Former [2009/18]Jacob, Reuben Ellis , et al
R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London
SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date07766306.019.07.2007
[2009/18]
WO2007GB02741
Priority number, dateGB2006001445220.07.2006         Original published format: GB 0614452
[2009/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008009946
Date:24.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2051770
Date:29.04.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008
[2009/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2051770
Date:19.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61M39/10
[2009/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/18]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLUID-VERBINDUNGSSYSTEM[2009/18]
English:FLUID CONNECTOR SYSTEM[2009/18]
French:SYSTÈME DE CONNECTEURS POUR FLUIDE[2009/18]
Entry into regional phase19.02.2009National basic fee paid 
19.02.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
19.02.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/18]
17.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.05.2013Fee for grant paid
03.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.04.2012
Opposition(s)20.03.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200903   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2009
31.07.201206   M06   Fee paid on   15.01.2013
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.07.2007
AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
TR19.06.2013
IE19.07.2013
LU19.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
TR19.06.2013
IE19.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/33]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
IE19.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/24]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/21]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/20]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/18]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/16]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CY31.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/14]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CY31.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/11]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CY31.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/10]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CY31.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/09]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/08]BE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/02]FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/50]FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/48]LT19.06.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT19.06.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]US5286067  (CHOKSI PRADIP [US]) [X] 1-4,8,26 * column 4, lines 27-51 * * column 5, lines 10-27 * * column 6, lines 18-32; figures 2,4,5 *;
 [X]WO2005055919  (VYGON [FR], et al) [X] 1-8,26 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 28 * * page 9, lines 11-30 * * figure 6; claim 1 *;
 [XA]US6612624  (SEGAL SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1-19,26 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0037] - [0040] - [0043] , [0044] , [0049]; figures 5B,6B,6C,8D * [A] 20-24;
 [A]GB2383828  (BICKFORD SMITH PHILIP [GB], et al) [A] 1-24,26 * page 18, line 31 - page 19, line 13 *
by applicantUS5286067