Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2064448

EP2064448 - VACUUM PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.05.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
17.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Edwards Limited
Innovation Drive
Burgess Hill
West Sussex RH15 9TW / GB
[2017/04]
Former [2009/23]For all designated states
Edwards Limited
Manor Royal
Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9LW / GB
Inventor(s)01 / TOLLNER, Martin, Ernst
Edwards Limited
York Road
Burgess Hill West Sussex RH15 9TT / GB
02 / BREWSTER, Barrie, Dudley
Edwards Limited
York Road
Burgess Hill West Sussex RH15 9TT / GB
 [2013/07]
Former [2009/23]01 / TOLLNER, Martin, Ernst
Edwards Limited York Road
Burgess Hill West Sussex RH15 9TT / GB
02 / BREWSTER, Barrie, Dudley
Edwards Limited York Road
Burgess Hill West Sussex RH15 9TT / GB
Representative(s)Norton, Ian Andrew , et al
Edwards Limited
Innovation Drive
Burgess Hill
West Sussex RH15 9TW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/23]Clark, Charles Robert , et al
Edwards Limited Intellectual Property Manor Royal Crawley
West Sussex RH10 9LW / GB
Former [2009/50]Clark, Charles Robert , et al
Edwards Limited Manor Royal
Crawley, West Sussex RH10 2LW / GB
Former [2009/23]Clark, Charles Robert , et al
Edwards Limited Manor Royal
Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9LW / GB
Application number, filing date07766464.727.07.2007
[2009/23]
WO2007GB50452
Priority number, dateGB2006001874522.09.2006         Original published format: GB 0618745
GB2007000051211.01.2007         Original published format: GB 0700512
[2009/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008035113
Date:27.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2064448
Date:03.06.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2008
[2009/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2064448
Date:05.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:F04D17/16, F04D19/04, F04D29/04
[2009/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VAKUUMPUMPE[2009/23]
English:VACUUM PUMP[2009/23]
French:POMPE À VIDE[2009/23]
Entry into regional phase25.02.2009National basic fee paid 
25.02.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
25.02.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/23]
12.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2013Fee for grant paid
23.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.07.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.02.2014  05.10.2016  WITHDRAWN
Oerlikon Leybold Vacuum GmbH
Bonner Strasse 498
50968 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 02  27.02.2014  05.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Pfeiffer Vacuum GmbH
Berliner Strasse 43
35614 Asslar / DE
Opponent's representative
Knefel, Cordula
Wertherstrasse 16
35578 Wetzlar / DE
 [2016/45]
Former [2014/15]
Opponent(s)01  22.02.2014  22.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Oerlikon Leybold Vacuum GmbH
Bonner Strasse 498
50968 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 02  27.02.2014  05.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Pfeiffer Vacuum GmbH
Berliner Strasse 43
35614 Asslar / DE
Opponent's representative
Knefel, Cordula
Wertherstrasse 16
35578 Wetzlar / DE
Former [2014/14]
Opponent(s)01  22.02.2014   
Oerlikon Leybold Vacuum GmbH
Bonner Strasse 498
50968 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
09.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
13.04.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.04.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition14.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1287/17
23.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
31.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1287/17
04.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
11.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.07.2007
AT05.06.2013
BE05.06.2013
CY05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
MT05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
TR05.06.2013
IE27.07.2013
LU27.07.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT05.06.2013
BE05.06.2013
CY05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
MT05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
TR05.06.2013
IE27.07.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2015/30]AT05.06.2013
BE05.06.2013
CY05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
IE27.07.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/33]AT05.06.2013
BE05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
IE27.07.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/21]AT05.06.2013
BE05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/16]AT05.06.2013
BE05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/14]AT05.06.2013
BE05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/11]AT05.06.2013
BE05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/10]AT05.06.2013
BE05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/08]AT05.06.2013
BE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/02]AT05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
ES16.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT05.06.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]DE2249985  (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE19709205  (LEYBOLD VAKUUM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * column 2, lines 24-55 *;
 [X]WO2004097224  (BOC GROUP PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,15,17 * abstract * * pages 7-8 * * figures 2-5 *;
 [A]FR2820178  (LUK FAHRZEUG HYDRAULIK [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2502323  (PITNER ALFRED [FR], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2004099622  (LEYBOLD VAKUUM GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6585480
 DE2249985
 WO2004099622
 DE19709205