Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027335

EP2027335 - A PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING TORQUE IN A CALENDERING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.04.2011
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.05.2011  [2011/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
The Procter and Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ZEIGLER, Mark
734 Hunters Run
Oneida, Wisconsin 54155 / US
02 / FRANZ, Michael, Joseph
3534 Liberty Bell Drive
Hamilton, Ohio 45011 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)L'Huillier, Florent Charles
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]L'Huillier, Florent Charles
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date07766743.413.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007IB52249
Priority number, dateUS2006045180513.06.2006         Original published format: US 451805
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007144841
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027335
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:D21G1/00
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DREHMOMENTSTEUERUNG IN EINEM KALANDRIERSYSTEM[2009/09]
English:A PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING TORQUE IN A CALENDERING SYSTEM[2009/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COUPLE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE CALANDRAGE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase19.11.2008National basic fee paid 
19.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
19.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
06.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/18]
21.12.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1316643  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-10 * paragraphs [0051] - [0054] * * paragraphs [0071] - [0075] * * figure - *;
 [A]EP0949378  (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0036] , [0039] , [0040] * * figure - *;
 [A]US1793114  (OGDEN MINTON) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 60-93 * * claim 1 * * figure *;
 [A]US1987670  (DRAKE CHESTER W, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 6 * * claims 3-5 * * figure *