Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025676

EP2025676 - NOVEL INDAZOLE DERIVATIVE HAVING SPIRO RING STRUCTURE IN SIDE CHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.12.2013
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.01.2014  [2014/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ube Industries, Ltd.
1978-96, Oaza Kogushi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 780-8633 / JP
For all designated states
SANTEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
9-19, Shimoshinjo 3-chome Higashiyodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 533-8651 / JP
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / HAGIHARA, Masahiko
c/o UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD. ORGANIC CHEMICAL RESEARCH LABORATORY 1978-5, Oaza Kogushi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 780-8633 / JP
02 / TSUZAKI, Yasunori
c/o UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD. ORGANIC CHEMICAL RESEARCH LABORATORY 1978-5, Oaza Kogushi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 780-8633 / JP
03 / KOMORI, Ken-ichi
c/o UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD. ORGANIC CHEMICAL RESEARCH LABORATORY 1978-5, Oaza Kogushi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 780-8633 / JP
04 / NISHIDA, Hiroshi
c/o UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD. ORGANIC CHEMICAL RESEARCH LABORATORY 1978-5, Oaza Kogushi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 780-8633 / JP
05 / KIDO, Kazutaka
c/o SANTEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 8916-16, Takayama-cho
Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0101 / JP
06 / FUJIMOTO, Tomokazu
c/o SANTEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 8916-16, Takayama-cho
Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0101 / JP
07 / MATSUGI, Takeshi
c/o SANTEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 8916-16, Takayama-cho
Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0101 / JP
08 / SHIMAZAKI, Atsushi
c/o SANTEN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 8916-16, Takayama-cho
Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0101 / JP
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date07767066.908.06.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007JP61598
Priority number, dateJP2006015950108.06.2006         Original published format: JP 2006159501
[2009/08]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007142323
Date:13.12.2007
Language:JA
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025676
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/04, A61K31/416, A61K31/4439, A61P1/00, A61P9/00, A61P9/10, A61P9/12, A61P11/06, A61P15/06, A61P19/10, A61P25/28, A61P27/02, A61P27/06, A61P29/00, A61P31/04, A61P31/18, A61P35/00, A61P37/06, A61P43/00, C07D231/56
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:NEUES INDAZOLDERIVAT MIT SPIRORINGSTRUKTUR IN DER SEITENKETTE[2009/08]
English:NOVEL INDAZOLE DERIVATIVE HAVING SPIRO RING STRUCTURE IN SIDE CHAIN[2009/08]
French:NOUVEAU DÉRIVÉ D'INDAZOLE AYANT UNE STRUCTURE CYCLIQUE SPIRO DANS UNE CHAÎNE LATÉRALE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2008Translation filed 
27.11.2008National basic fee paid 
27.11.2008Search fee paid 
27.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
24.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/04]
19.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/04]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.04.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]WO2005035506  (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP], et al);
 [A]WO02100833  (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP], et al);
 [A]WO2005082890  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al);
 [A]JP2004528314  ;
 [A]JP2004524350  ;
 [A]WO2005080394  (BIOAXONE THERAPEUTIQUE INC [CA])
by applicantWO9806433
 WO9723222
 WO9964011
 WO0156988
 WO02100833
 WO2005035506
 WO02076976
 WO02076977
 WO0009162
 WO0057914
 WO03050087
    - NATURE, (1997), vol. 389, pages 990 - 994,
    - J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, page 32418,
    - MICHAEL E. WRIGHT ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1993), vol. 58, page 4122,
    - J., BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, page 32418,