Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028175

EP2028175 - METHOD OF REPLACING DISPERSION MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc.
5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8324 / JP
[2015/37]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc.
5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8324 / JP
For all designated states
TOYOBO CO., LTD.
2-8, Dojima Hama 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8230 / JP
For all designated states
MIZUSHIMA AROMA COMPANY, LTD.
3-1, Mizushima Nakadori 2-chome Kurashiki-shi
Okayama 712-8072 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / INARI, Masato
c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc.
Mizushima Plant
10, Mizushimakaigandori 3-chome
Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 712-8525 / JP
02 / ZAIMA, Fumiya
c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc.
Mizushima Plant
10, Mizushimakaigandori 3-chome
Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 712-8525 / JP
 [2016/46]
Former [2009/09]01 / INARI, Masato
c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc., Mizushima Plant 10, Mizushimakaigandori 3-chome
Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 712-8525 / JP
02 / ZAIMA, Fumiya
c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc., Mizushima Plant 10, Mizushimakaigandori 3-chome
Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 712-8525 / JP
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[2016/46]
Former [2009/51]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2009/09]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Brucknerstrasse 20
D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date07767086.708.06.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007JP61667
Priority number, dateJP2006016220712.06.2006         Original published format: JP 2006162207
[2009/09]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007145149
Date:21.12.2007
Language:JA
[2007/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028175
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2028175
Date:16.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07C51/47, C07C51/43, C07C63/26, B01D9/00
[2016/24]
Former International [2011/34]C07C51/47, C07C63/26, B01D12/00
Former International [2009/09]C07C51/47, B01D12/00, C07C63/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/46]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ERSETZEN VON DISPERSIONSMEDIUM[2009/09]
English:METHOD OF REPLACING DISPERSION MEDIUM[2009/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE REMPLACEMENT DE MILIEU DE DISPERSION[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase08.12.2008Translation filed 
08.12.2008National basic fee paid 
08.12.2008Search fee paid 
08.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
28.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.09.2016Fee for grant paid
08.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.10.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
06.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP12155582.5  / EP2455360
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.04.2012
Opposition(s)17.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
15.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
IE08.06.2017
LU08.06.2017
MT08.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
FR30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/29]AT16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
IE08.06.2017
LU08.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
FR30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/23]AT16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
IE08.06.2017
LU08.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/21]AT16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
LU08.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/11]AT16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/52]AT16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/35]AT16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV16.11.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4212995  (SHIRAKI SHIGEMI [JP]) [X] 1 * figure 1; example 1; claim 1 * [I] 2-4;
 [XI]US2794832  (KORNELIS RIETEMA) [X] 1 * figure II; claim 1 * [I] 2-4
International search[Y]JPH08231465  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO, et al);
 [Y]JPH08308309  (HAYASHI SATOSHI);
 [Y]JP2001247868  (EKOTEKKU KK);
 [Y]JPH07274963  (SAI TEIKI);
 [A]JPS5753431  (HAAKOFUINA)
ExaminationEP0719576
 WO9507325
by applicantGB2014985
 JPS5753431B
 JPH08231465