Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2033650

EP2033650 - INHIBITOR OF EXPRESSION OF NUCLEAR TRANSCRIPTION FACTOR AP-1, AND PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCT AND PRODUCT USING THE INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.05.2012
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.06.2012  [2012/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ARKRAY, Inc.
57, Nishiaketa-cho
Higashikujo
Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 601-8045 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/11]For all designated states
Arkray, Inc.
57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAGI, Masayuki
c/o ARKRAY, Inc: 57 Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo
Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP
02 / MATSUURA, Nobuyasu
507-193, Yokoikami, Okayama-shi
Okayama 701-1145 / JP
 [2009/11]
Representative(s)Vocke, Henrik
Hoffmann - Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/31]Vocke, Henrik
Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2009/11]Behnisch, Werner
Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date07767198.019.06.2007
[2009/11]
WO2007JP62340
Priority number, dateJP2006017299722.06.2006         Original published format: JP 2006172997
[2009/11]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007148697
Date:27.12.2007
Language:JA
[2007/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2033650
Date:11.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP27.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/7048, A23L1/30, A61K8/60, A61K8/97, A61K36/00, A61K36/28, A61P3/06, A61P3/10, A61P9/10, A61P9/12, A61P11/00, A61P11/06, A61P13/08, A61P15/00, A61P17/00, A61P17/02, A61P17/04, A61P17/06, A61P17/10, A61P19/02
[2009/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/11]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HEMMER DER EXPRESSION DES NUKLEAREN TRANSKRIPTIONSFAKTORS AP-1 SOWIE PHARMAZEUTISCHES PRODUKT MIT DEM HEMMER[2009/11]
English:INHIBITOR OF EXPRESSION OF NUCLEAR TRANSCRIPTION FACTOR AP-1, AND PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCT AND PRODUCT USING THE INHIBITOR[2009/11]
French:INHIBITEUR DE L'EXPRESSION DU FACTEUR DE TRANSCRIPTION NUCLÉAIRE AP-1, ET PRODUITS PHARMACEUTIQUES OU AUTRES UTILISANT CET INHIBITEUR[2009/11]
Entry into regional phase04.11.2008Translation filed 
04.11.2008National basic fee paid 
04.11.2008Search fee paid 
04.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/11]
15.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2010Observations by third parties
07.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/23]
18.01.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/23]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.01.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2005070440  (HAGGAG EMAN GABER [EG]; ABU-MUSTAFA MAGDA ADEL [EG]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6890569  (TANKE ANN M [US]) [X] 1-11 * 'Summary of the Invention' * * 'Claims' *;
 [A]JP2003055213
 [X]  - GEBAUER H, "PHARMAKOLOGISCHE WIRKUNGEN VON KAMILLENINHALTSTOFFEN//PHARMACOLOGICAL EFFECTS OF CHAMOMILE ACTIVE INGREDIENTS", SOFW-JOURNAL SEIFEN, OELE, FETTE, WACHSE, VERLAG FUR CHEMISCHE INDUSTRIE, AUGSBURG, DE, (20060101), vol. 132, no. 1/02, ISSN 0942-7694, pages 34 - 38, XP009067568 [X] 1-11 * 'Einleitung' * * page 36 * * tables 1,2 * * page 37 *
 [X]  - HERNANDEZ-CERUELOS A ET AL, "Inhibitory effect of chamomile essential oil on the sister chromatid exchanges induced by daunorubicin and methyl methanesulfonate in mouse bone marrow", TOXICOLOGY LETTERS, ELSEVIER BIOMEDICAL PRESS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 135, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-4274, (20020901), pages 103 - 110, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/journal/03784274, XP009122174 [X] 1-11 * abstract * * page 104, column 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/
 [X]  - MACDONALD RUTH S ET AL, "Plant compounds protect from prostate cancer via an ER-alpha dependent mechanism", FASEB JOURNAL, FED. OF AMERICAN SOC. FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, BETHESDA, MD, US, vol. 20, no. 4, Part 1, ISSN 0892-6638, (20060301), page A149, URL: http://www.fasebj.org/, XP009122171 [X] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [X]  - EDDOUKS M ET AL, "Potent hypoglycaemic activity of the aqueous extract of Chamaemelum nobile in normal and streptozotocin-induced diabetic rats", DIABETES RESEARCH AND CLINICAL PRACTICE, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 67, no. 3, ISSN 0168-8227, (20050301), pages 189 - 195, (20050301), XP025292860 [X] 1-11 * abstract * * 'Introduction' 'Discussion' *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.diabres.2004.07.015
 [X]  - AERTGEERTS P ET AL, "COMPARATIVE TESTING OF KAMILLOSAN CREAM AND STEROIDAL (0.25% HYDROCORTISONE, 0.75% FLUOCORTIN BUTYL ESTER) AND NON-STEROIDAL (5% BUFEXAMAC) DERMATOLOGIC AGENTS IN MAINTENANCE THERAPY OF ECZEMATOUS DISEASES", H + G. ZEITSCHRIFT FUER HAUTKRANKHEITEN, GROSS VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (19850101), vol. 60, no. 3, ISSN 0301-0481, pages 270 - 277, XP008073912 [X] 1-11 * abstract * * 'Introduction' 'Discussion' *
 [X]  - "- Composition for treating skin diseases such as psoriasis - contains celandine, greater plantain, lily of the valley flowers, wild camomile, honey, egg protein, eucalyptus oil and lanolin", DERWENT HOST- DERWENT, (1998), XP002169770 [X] 1-11 * abstract *
 [X]  - MEYER S ET AL, "Use of phytopharmaceutical agents in dermatology; Indications, therapeutic approaches and side effects", DER HAUTARZT ; ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR DERMATOLOGIE, VENEROLOGIE UND VERWANDTE GEBIETE, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20050501), vol. 56, no. 5, ISSN 1432-1173, pages 483 - 502, XP019319539 [X] 1-11 * page 489 - page 490 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00105-005-0949-y
 [X]  - EDDOUKS M ET AL, "Ethnopharmacological survey of medicinal plants used for the treatment of diabetes mellitus, hypertension and cardiac diseases in the south-east region of Morocco (Tafilalet)", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS LTD, IE, (20021001), vol. 82, no. 2-3, ISSN 0378-8741, pages 97 - 103, XP009122120 [X] 1-11 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-8741(02)00164-2
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 52, Database accession no. 2003-546016, XP002545569 & JP2003055213 A 20030226 (ITOEN KK) [A] * abstract *
International search[A]JP2005194246  (ICHIMARU PHARCOS INC);
 [A]JP2006016312  (MORISHITA JINTAN CO);
 [A]JP2005343873  (KAO CORP);
 [A]JP2003212770  (ICHIMARU PHARCOS INC)
 [X]  - KOENIG G.M. ET AL., "Hypoglycemic activity of an HMG-containing flavonoid glucoside, Chamaemeloside, from Chamamelum nobile", PLANTA MEDICA, (1998), vol. 64, no. 7, pages 612 - 614, XP003020240

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2006-957532
 [A]  - CARNAT A. ET AL., "The aromatic and polyphenolic composition of Roman camomile tea", FITOTERAPIA, (2004), vol. 75, no. 1, pages 32 - 38, XP002384563
by applicantJP2003055213
    - GABRIELA ET AL., PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 41, pages 643 - 646
other   - "Marham-e-Qust", TKDL, Database accession no. MA2/550, XP003029759
    - AMINUDDAULA ABUL FARJ LBN AL-QUFF MASEEBI, Kitaab-al-U'mdah-fil-Jeraahat, (1937), page 182
    - "Marham-e-Deegar", TKDL, Database accession no. MA2/542, XP003029760
    - AMINUDDAULA ABUL FARJ LBN AL-QUFF MASEEBI, Kitaab-al-U'mdah-fil-Jeraahat, (1937), page 180
    - "Marham-e-Mastagi", TKDL, Database accession no. MA2/539, XP003029761
    - AMINUDDAULA ABUL FARJ LBN AL-QUFF MASEEBI, Kitaab-al-U'mdah-fil-Jeraahat, (1937), page 179
    - "Mazoogh Baar-a- -e-Qula", TKDL, Database accession no. AA3/1505, XP003029762
    - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD.BIN ZAKARIYYA AL RAZI, Kitaab-al-Haawi-fil-Tibb, (1977), vol. III, page 321
    - "Zimaad E Chashm", TKDL, Database accession no. AH3/2488, XP003029763
    - ALI LBN ABBAS MAJOOSI, Kaamil-al-Senaa'h, (2005), page 286
    - "Aabzan Barae Sartaan-e-Reham", TKDL, Database accession no. AH5/05G, XP003029764
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, (1909), pages 300 - 301
    - "Maa-al-Usool Barae Bolimoos", TKDL, Database accession no. NA4/4716, XP003029765
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Najm-al-Ghani, (1928), page 738
    - "Majoon Filasafa", TKDL, Database accession no. RS22/1024, XP003029766
    - RASATANTRASARAH EVAM SIDDHAPRAYOGASAMGRAHAH, (1990), page 801
    - "Raughan-e-Baaboonah (Baboonah Ka Tel)", TKDL, Database accession no. NA2/291, XP003029767
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, (1911), vol. I, page 684
    - "Matbookh Barae Busoor Labaniyah", TKDL, Database accession no. AH5/173, XP003029768
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, (1909), page 347
    - "Zimaad-e-Baaboona", TKDL, Database accession no. BA4/2234F, XP003029769
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Ikseer Azam, (1872), vol. IV, page 3779