Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021735

EP2021735 - ATHLETIC OR OTHER PERFORMANCE SENSING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2017
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIKE Innovate C.V.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
[2016/42]
Former [2014/32]For all designated states
NIKE Innovate C.V.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Nike International, Ltd.
Canon's Court 22 Victoria Street Hamilton, Bermuda
HM12 / GB
Inventor(s)01 / BERNER, William E.
Nike, Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
02 / SHUM, Albert
Nike, Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
03 / CASE, Charles W.
Nike, Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
04 / SCHROCK, Allan M.
Nike, Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
05 / NIEGOWSKI, James A.
Nike, Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
06 / RAUCHHOLZ, William F.
Nike, Inc.
One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
 [2016/42]
Former [2009/07]01 / BERNER, William E.
Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
02 / SHUM, Albert
Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
03 / CASE, Charles W.
Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
04 / SCHROCK, Allan M.
Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
05 / NIEGOWSKI, James A.
Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
06 / RAUCHHOLZ, William F.
Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US
Representative(s)McCartney, Jonathan William , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[2014/32]
Former [2009/07]Tombling, Adrian George , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date07776088.224.04.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US09919
Priority number, dateUS2006041645803.05.2006         Original published format: US 416458
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007130287
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021735
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021735
Date:19.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:A43B3/00, A61B5/11, G01C22/00, A43B13/00
[2016/15]
Former International [2009/07]G01C22/00, A43B13/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/42]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEME ZUR ERFASSUNG SPORTLICHER ODER ANDERER LEISTUNGEN[2009/07]
English:ATHLETIC OR OTHER PERFORMANCE SENSING SYSTEMS[2009/07]
French:SYSTEMES DE DETECTION DE PERFORMANCE ATHLETIQUES OU AUTRES[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase13.11.2008National basic fee paid 
13.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
17.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.03.2016
07.03.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
25.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2016Fee for grant paid
05.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16194447.5  / EP3141868
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.03.2012
Opposition(s)20.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
12.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
10.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
IE24.04.2017
LU24.04.2017
MT24.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/23]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
IE24.04.2017
LU24.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
Former [2018/13]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
LU24.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
Former [2018/06]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/52]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/38]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/37]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/35]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/34]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/33]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV19.10.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]US6788200  (JAMEL MITCHELL W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-22,26-31,35 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6017128  (GOLDSTON MARK R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,10-14,16-22,24-28,35 * column 6, line 50 - column 7; figure - *;
 [X]WO9526652  (BBC INTERNATIONAL LTD [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10-22,26-28,35 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0152057  (DASSLER PUMA SPORTSCHUH [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-22,26-34 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1362522  (ADIDAS INT MARKETING BV [NL]) [X] 2-4,14,16-22,26-28,35,38 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1120056  (STEFCOM SPA [IT]) [X] 2-4,23,36-38 * column 5, line 7, paragraph 40 - line 19; figure 6 *