Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021675

EP2021675 - REINSTATEMENT OF AN EXISTING CONNECTION IN A LINED CONDUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.06.2011
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INA Acquisition Corp.
1007 Orange Street, Suite 1410, Nemours Building
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / POLIVKA, Richard, C.
20w114 97th Street
Lemont, IL 60439 / US
02 / OXNER, Keith, B.
1818 Summer Lake Drive
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
03 / HEUISER, Stephen, B.
674 Canary Estates Drive
Manchester, MO 63021 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Maiwald, Walter
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Maiwald, Walter
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date07776441.327.04.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US10366
Priority number, dateUS20060795364P27.04.2006         Original published format: US 795364 P
US20060800914P16.05.2006         Original published format: US 800914 P
US20060872826P05.12.2006         Original published format: US 872826 P
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007127447
Date:08.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021675
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:F16L41/14, F16L55/26
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BA26.11.2008
HR26.11.2008
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WIEDEREINSETZUNG EINER BESTEHENDEN VERBINDUNG IN EINEM AUSGEKLEIDETEN ROHR[2009/07]
English:REINSTATEMENT OF AN EXISTING CONNECTION IN A LINED CONDUIT[2009/07]
French:RETABLISSEMENT D'UN BRANCHEMENT EXISTANT DANS UN CONDUIT REVETU[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2008National basic fee paid 
26.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
23.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/28]
22.02.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/28]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.12.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201105   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XAY]WO9945307  (UNITED UTILITIES PLC [GB]; GRACE JOHN C [GB]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7 * figures 1,4 * [A] 5,16 [Y] 2,8-10,25,26;
 [XAY]EP0253630  (ANGUS FIRE ARMOUR LTD [GB]; THAMES WATER AUTHORITY [GB]) [X] 1,3,4,8 [A] 5-7,9,10,16,25,26 [Y] 2,8;
 [YDA]US5737822  (DRIVER FRANKLIN T [US] ET AL) [YD] 2 * column 1, line 40; figure 7 * [A] 20-24;
 [A]DE202005004781U  (BAUKU TROISDORFER BAU UND KUNS [DE]; CONDOR ROHR SYSTEM TECHNIK GMB [D) [A] 1,16 * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]WO9015347  (WILCOCK NORMAN BRIAN [GB]) [Y] 25,26 * page 3, paragraph 1 *;
 [AY]US2003116211  (WARD ROBERT M [US]) [A] 16 * paragraph [0067]; figure 1 * [Y] 9,10;
 [A]WO9111283  (TRB SPECIALTY REHABILITATION I [US]) [A] 16 * figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0978681  (SHONAN GOSEI JUSHI SEISAKUSHO [JP]; YOKOSHIMA & CO [JP]; GET INC [JP];) [A] 16 * figure 6 *;
 [A]EP0310679  (ASHIMORI IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 16 * figure 2 *;
 [XAY]US3531142  (PEASLEY JOHN A) [X] 11-14 * figures 1,2 * [A] 15 [Y] 12;
 [XAY]US1887423  (PARKER ARTHUR L) [X] 11,13,14 * figure 1 * [A] 15 [Y] 12;
 [XAY]GB566954  (PERCY GRAHAM CALDWELL) [X] 11,13,14 [A] 15 [Y] 12;
 [A]US5199145  (MCMILLAN JIM S [US] ET AL) [A] 20-24 * figure 13 *;
 [X]US5150989  (LONG JR CHARLES A [US] ET AL) [X] 27,28 * column 14, lines 24-35; claim 1 *;
 [X]WO03078886  (THAMES WATER UTILITIES [GB]; BARNARD DOMINIC [GB]; CROCKER ROBERT [GB]) [X] 27,28 * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 2 *