Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022024

EP2022024 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROTOCOL FILTERING FOR QUALITY OF SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.05.2013
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2013Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.06.2013  [2013/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harris Corporation
1025 West Nasa Blvd. MS A-11i
Melbourne, FL 32919 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / SMITH, Donald L.
584 Hawksbill Island Drive
Satellite Beach, FL 32937 / US
02 / GALLUSCIO, Anthony P.
549 Hummingbird Drive
Indialantic, FL 32903 / US
03 / KNAZIK, Robert J.
112 St. Croix Avenue
Cocoa Beach, FL 32931 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Steffen
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Schmidt, Steffen
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date07776574.101.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US10559
Priority number, dateUS2006041605702.05.2006         Original published format: US 416057
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007130415
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2022024
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.06.2008
ClassificationInternational:G08C15/00, H04J3/00, H04J3/02, H04J3/16, H04J3/18, H04J3/22, H04J3/24, H04J15/00, H04L1/00, H04L12/26, H04L12/28, H04L12/56, H04L12/66
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2009/28]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR PROTOKOLLFILTERUNG FÜR DIENSTGÜTE[2009/07]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROTOCOL FILTERING FOR QUALITY OF SERVICE[2009/07]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LE FILTRAGE DE PROTOCOLES POUR LA QUALITÉ DE SERVICE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2008National basic fee paid 
01.12.2008Search fee paid 
01.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
03.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR
06.05.2013Application withdrawn by applicant  [2013/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US6072781  (FEENEY JAMES WILLIAM [US], et al);
 [X]US6279035  (BROWN BRIAN [US], et al);
 [X]US6401117  (NARAD CHARLES E [US], et al);
 [X]US6408341  (FEENEY JAMES WILLIAM [US], et al);
 [X]US6625650  (STELLIGA TONY [US]);
 [X]US6633835  (MORAN MIKE [US], et al);
 [X]US6778546  (EPPS GARRY P [US], et al);
 [X]US7200144  (TERRELL WILLIAM C [US], et al);
 [X]US7330908  (JUNGCK PEDER J [US]);
 [X]  - MADUBATA C.D., "Prioritization of the Joint Battle Space Infosphere (JBI) Traffic and Priority with Reciprocity CAC Protocol for the JBI Network", PROCEEDINGS ON THE 38TH SOUTHEASTERN SYMPOSIUM ON SYSTEM THEORY, TENNESSEE TECHNOLOGICAL UNIVERSITY, (20060305), XP010909597

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SSST.2006.1619140
 [X]  - "Internet Protocol DARPA Internet Program Protocol Specification", DEFENSE ADVANCED RESEARCH PROJECTS AGENCY, (198109), XP015006774