Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023802

EP2023802 - TEST SENSOR WITH UNDER-FILL PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.08.2010
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.09.2010  [2010/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer HealthCare, LLC
555 White Plains Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / DOSMANN, Andrew, J.
50607 Cherry Road
Granger, Indiana 46530 / US
02 / DIEHL, Jason, R.
6435 E. Leighty Road
Kendallville, Indiana 46755 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Linhart, Angela
Bayer HealthCare AG
CAO Law & Patents
Patents & Licensing
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Linhart, Angela
Bayer HealthCare AG CAO Law & Patents, Patents & Licensing
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Former [2009/08]Linhart, Angela
Bayer HealthCare AG CAO Law & Patents Patents & Licensing
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Application number, filing date07776603.803.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US10613
Priority number, dateUS20060798488P08.05.2006         Original published format: US 798488 P
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007133456
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023802
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, G01N33/48, B01L3/00
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TESTSENSOR MIT UNTERFÜLLUNGSSCHUTZ[2009/08]
English:TEST SENSOR WITH UNDER-FILL PROTECTION[2009/08]
French:CAPTEUR D'ANALYSE COMPRENANT UNE PROTECTION CONTRE UN REMPLISSAGE INSUFFISANT[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase08.12.2008National basic fee paid 
08.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
11.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/37]
28.04.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201004   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO0172220  (USF FILTRATION & SEPARATIONS [US]) [X] 1-9,12-15,17,20,22,23 * page 7, line 18 - page 9, line 12 * * claims 18,19 * [Y] 10,21;
 [X]EP1389443  (BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC [US]) [X] 1,4,6-8,13-16,19 * paragraphs [0026] - [0033] *;
 [Y]WO2005112742  (BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC [US]; CHARLTON STEVEN C [US]; MARFURT KAREN L [US) [Y] 10,21 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2004054267  (FELDMAN BENJAMIN J [US] ET AL) [X] 23 * paragraphs [0190] , [0191] *