Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2019857

EP2019857 - CD40 AGONIST ANTIBODY/TYPE1 INTERFERON SYNERGISTIC ADJUVANT COMBINATION, CONJUGATES CONTAINING AND USE THEREOF AS A THERAPEUTIC TO ENHANCE CELLULAR IMMUNITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of Colorado, a body corporate
1800 Grant Street, 8th Floor
Denver, CO 80203 / US
[2009/47]
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
The Regents of the University of Colorado
1800 Grant Street 8th Floor
Denver, Colorado 80203 / US
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
The Regents of the University of Colorado
4001 Discovery Drive Suite 390 Campus Box 588 SYS
Boulder, CO 80309 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KEDL, Ross
7524 S. Cook Way
Centennial, CO 80122 / US
02 / SANCHEZ, Phillip, J.
1400 Jackson Street
K803
Denver, CO 80206 / US
03 / HALUSZCZAK, Catherine
1400 Jackson Street
K803
Denver, CO 80206 / US
 [2013/33]
Former [2009/16]01 / KEDL, Ross
5867 E. Long Place
Centennial, CO 80112 / US
02 / SANCHEZ, Phillip, J.
1400 Jackson Street K803
Denver, CO 80206 / US
03 / HALUSZCZAK, Catherine
1400 Jackson Street K803
Denver, CO 80206 / US
Former [2009/06]01 / KEDL, Ross
5867 E. Long Place
Centennial, CO 80015 / US
02 / SANCHEZ, Phillip, J.
1400 Jackson Street K803
Denver, CO 80206 / US
03 / HALUSZCZAK, Catherine
1400 Jackson Street K803
Denver, CO 80206 / US
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2009/06]Baldock, Sharon Claire , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date07776657.403.05.2007
[2009/06]
WO2007US10690
Priority number, dateUS20060796867P03.05.2006         Original published format: US 796867 P
US20060809821P01.06.2006         Original published format: US 809821 P
US20060842009P05.09.2006         Original published format: US 842009 P
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007130493
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2019857
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2019857
Date:28.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.01.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/20, C12N5/10, A61K39/245, A61K39/285, A61K47/48, A61K48/00, C07K16/28, C07K14/555, A61K38/00, A61K39/39, A61K39/00, A61K39/12, C07K14/705
[2015/48]
Former International [2009/06]C12N1/20, C12N5/06, C12N5/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/39]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYNERGISTISCHE HILFSSTOFFKOMBINATION AUS CD40-AGONIST-ANTIKÖRPER/TYP-1-INTERFERON, DIESE ENTHALTENDE KONJUGATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS THERAPEUTIKA ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG DER ZELLIMMUNITÄT[2009/06]
English:CD40 AGONIST ANTIBODY/TYPE1 INTERFERON SYNERGISTIC ADJUVANT COMBINATION, CONJUGATES CONTAINING AND USE THEREOF AS A THERAPEUTIC TO ENHANCE CELLULAR IMMUNITY[2009/06]
French:COMBINAISON ADJUVANTE SYNERGIQUE D'ANTICORPS AGONISTE CD40/INTERFÉRON DE TYPE 1, CONJUGUÉS CONTENANT UNE TELLE COMBINAISON ET UTILISATION EN TANT QU'AGENT THÉRAPEUTIQUE POUR AMÉLIORER L'IMMUNITE CELLULAIRE[2009/22]
Former [2009/06]COMBINAISON ADJUVANTE SYNERGIQUE D'ANTICORPS AGONISTE CD40/INTERFERON DE TYPE 1, CONJUGUES CONTENANT UNE TELLE COMBINAISON ET UTILISATION EN TANT QU'AGENT THERAPEUTIQUE POUR AMELIORER L'IMMUNITE CELLULAIRE
Entry into regional phase02.12.2008National basic fee paid 
02.12.2008Search fee paid 
02.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
20.10.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.10.2014
30.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
09.10.2014Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
04.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2016Fee for grant paid
18.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP13152053.8  / EP2589654
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.01.2011
Opposition(s)29.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE03.05.2017
LU03.05.2017
MT03.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/23]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE03.05.2017
LU03.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/17]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
LU03.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/13]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2018/06]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/52]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/36]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/34]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/12]FI28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
Former [2017/07]LT28.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[I]US2005043517  (GILES-KOMAR JILL [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * example 4; table 5 *;
 [A]  - LUFT THOMAS ET AL, "IFN-alpha enhances CD40 ligand-mediated activation of immature monocyte-derived dendritic cells.", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY APR 2002 LNKD- PUBMED:11934873, (200204), vol. 14, no. 4, ISSN 0953-8178, pages 367 - 380, XP002584238 [A] 1-18 * page 376, column r, paragraph 3 * * page 377, column l, paragraph 3 * * page 377, column r, paragraph 3 *
 [T]  - KORNBLUTH RICHARD S ET AL, "Immunostimulatory combinations: designing the next generation of vaccine adjuvants.", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY NOV 2006 LNKD- PUBMED:16931603, (200611), vol. 80, no. 5, ISSN 0741-5400, pages 1084 - 1102, XP002584239 [T] 1-18 * page 1094, column r, paragraph 2 *
International search[X]US2005043517  (GILES-KOMAR JILL [US], et al);
 [X]US2004141950  (NOELLE RANDOLPH J [US], et al);
 [Y]  - AHONEN ET AL., "Combined TLR and CD40 triggering induces potent CD8+ T cell expansion with variable dependence on type I IFN", J. EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (200403), vol. 199, pages 775 - 784, XP003012397

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20031591
 [Y]  - PUCCHIO ET AL., "Immunizaiton of stage IV melanoma patients with Melan-A/MART-1 and gp100 peptides plus IFN-alpha results in the activation of specific CD8+ T cells and monocyte/dendritic cell precursors", CANCER RESEARCH, (20060501), vol. 66, pages 4943 - 4951, XP008099533

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-05-3396
 [Y]  - TARABAN ET AL., "Cutting edge: A critical role for CD70 in CD8 T cell priming by CD40-licensed APCs", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 173, pages 6542 - 6546, XP008099518
Examination   - SANTINI STEFANO M ET AL, "The natural alliance between type I interferon and dendritic cells and its role in linking innate and adaptive immunity.", JOURNAL OF INTERFERON & CYTOKINE RESEARCH : THE OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR INTERFERON AND CYTOKINE RESEARCH NOV 2002 LNKD- PUBMED:12513906, (200211), vol. 22, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1089/10799900260442494, ISSN 1079-9907, pages 1071 - 1080, XP009016834

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/10799900260442494
by applicantUS6843989
 US5475046
 US5720163
 US5589332
 US5741679
 US6410711
 US6391637
 US5981724
 US5961974
 US2004006006
    - MONDINO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., USA, (1996), vol. 93, page 2245
    - PULENDRAN ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1998), vol. 188, page 2075
    - JENKINS ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1994), vol. 1, page 443
    - KEARNEY ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1994), vol. 1, page 327
    - ARUFFO ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 72, page 291
    - FARRINGTON ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI., USA, (1994), vol. 91, page 1099
    - RENSHAW ET AL., J EXP MED, (1994), vol. 180, page 1889
    - LIU ET AL., SEMIN IMMUNOL, (1994), vol. 9, page 235
    - BISHOP ET AL., CYTOKINE GROWTH FACTOR REV, (2003), vol. 14, page 297
    - QUEZADA ET AL., ANNU REV IMMUNOL, (2004), vol. 22, page 307
    - O'SULLIVAN B; THOMAS R, CRIT REV IMMUNOL, (2003), vol. 22, page 83
    - LEFRANCOIS ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 164, page 725
    - BENNETT ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 393, page 478
    - RIDGE ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 393, page 474
    - SCHOENBERGER ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 393, page 474
    - MAURI ET AL., NAT MED, (2001), vol. 6, page 673
    - KEDL ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI., USA, (2001), vol. 98, page 10811
    - ERICKSON ET AL., J CLIN INVEST, (2002), vol. 109, page 613
    - VONDERHEIDE ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL, (2001), vol. 19, page 3280
    - SCHLOSSMAN ET AL., LEUKOCYTE TYPING, (1995), vol. 1, pages 547 - 556
    - PAULIE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 142, pages 590 - 595
    - AHONEN ET AL., J EXP MED, (2004), vol. 199, page 775
    - VANDERHEIDE ET AL., J CLIN. ONCOL., (200703), vol. 25, no. 7, pages 876 - 8833
    - VANDERHEIDE ET AL., J CLIN. ONCOL., (2001), vol. 19, no. 23, pages 4351 - 3
    - VONDERHEIDE ET AL., J CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 25, no. 7, pages 876 - 883
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY
    - AHONEN, C. L.; C. L. DOXSEE; S. M. MCGURRAN; T. R. RITER; W. F. WADE; R. J. BARTH; J. P. VASILAKOS; R. J. NOELLE; R. M. KEDL, "Combined TLR and CD40 triggering induces potent CD8+ T cell expansion with variable dependence on type I IFN", J EXP MED, (2004), vol. 199, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.20031591, page 775, XP003012397

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20031591
    - TOUGH, D. F., "Type I interferon as a link between innate and adaptive immunity through dendritic cell stimulation", LEUK LYMPHOMA, (2004), vol. 45, page 257
    - LE BON, A.; D. F. TOUGH, "Links between innate and adaptive immunity via type I interferon", CURR OPIN IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1016/S0952-7915(02)00354-0, page 432, XP004367708

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0952-7915(02)00354-0
    - LE BON, A.; N. ETCHART; C. ROSSMANN; M. ASHTON; S. HOU; D. GEWERT; P. BORROW; D. F. TOUGH, "Cross-priming of CD8+ T cells stimulated by virus-induced type I interferon", NAT IMMUNOL, (2003), vol. 4, page 1009
    - TOUGH, D. F.; S. SUN; X. ZHANG; J. SPRENT, "Stimulation of naive and memory T cells by cytokines", IMMUNOL REV, (1999), vol. 170, page 39
    - SPRENT, J.; X. ZHANG; S. SUN; D. TOUGH, "T-cell proliferation in vivo and the role of cytokines", PHILOS TRANS R SOC LOND B BIOL SCI, (2000), vol. 355, page 317
    - SPRENT, J., "Turnover of memory-phenotype CD8+ T cells", MICROBES INFECT, (2003), vol. 5, page 227
    - ZHANG, X.; S. SUN; HWANG, D. F. TOUGH; J. SPRENT, "Potent and selective stimulation of memory-phenotype CD8+ T cells in vivo by IL-15", IMMUNITY, (1998), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/S1074-7613(00)80564-6, page 591, XP002409703

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-7613(00)80564-6
    - TOUGH, D. F.; J. SPRENT, "Bystander stimulation of T cells in vivo by cytokines", VET IMMUNOL IMMUNOPATHOL, (1998), vol. 63, page 123
    - MARRACK, P.; J. KAPPLER; T. MITCHELL., "Type I interferons keep activated T cells alive", J EXP MED, (1999), vol. 189, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.189.3.521, page 521, XP002180245

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.189.3.521
    - MARRACK, P.; T. MITCHELL; J. BENDER; D. HILDEMAN; R. KEDL; K. TEAGUE; J. KAPPLER, "T-cell survival", IMMUNOL REV, (1998), vol. 165, page 279
    - MARRACK, P.; J. KAPPLER; T. MITCHELL, "Type I interferons keep activated T cells alive", J EXP MED, (1999), vol. 189, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.189.3.521, page 521, XP002180245

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.189.3.521
    - J IMMUNOL, (2005), vol. 174, page 4465
    - SPRENT, J.; X. ZHANG; S. SUN; D. TOUGH, "T-cell turnover in vivo and the role of cytokines", IMMUNOL LETT, (1999), vol. 65, page 21, XP027285375
    - LEVINGS, M. K.; R. SANGREGORIO; F. GALBIATI; S. SQUADRONE; R. DE WAAL MALEFYT; M. G. RONCAROLO, "IFN-alpha and IL-10 induce the differentiation of human type 1 T regulatory cells", J IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 166, page 5530, XP002379248
    - ADAM, O.; A. VERCELLONE; F. PAUL; P. F. MONSAN; G. PUZO, "A nondegradative route for the removal of endotoxin from exopolysaccharides", ANAL BIOCHEM, (1995), vol. 225, doi:doi:10.1006/abio.1995.1161, page 321, XP000578360

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1995.1161
    - BENDER, F. C.; J. C. WHITBECK; M. PONCE DE LEON; H. LOU; R. J. EISENBERG; G. H. COHEN, "Specific association of glycoprotein B with lipid rafts during herpes simplex virus entry", J VIROL, (2003), vol. 77, page 9542
    - KEDL, R. M.; M. JORDAN; T. POTTER; J. KAPPLER; P. MARRACK; S. DOW, "CD40 stimulation accelerates deletion of tumor-specific CD8(+) T cells in the absence of tumor-antigen vaccination", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2001), vol. 98, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.191371898, page 10811, XP009076195

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.191371898
    - KEDL, R. M.; W. A. REES; D. A. HILDEMAN; B. SCHAEFER; T. MITCHELL; J. KAPPLER; P. MARRACK, "T Cells Compete for Access to Antigen-bearing Antigen-presenting Cells", J. EXP. MED., (2000), vol. 192, page 1105
    - KEDL, R. M.; B. C. SCHAEFER; J. W. KAPPLER; P. MARRACK, T CELLS DOWN-MODULATE PEPTIDE-MHC COMPLEXES ON APCS IN VIVO, (2002), vol. 3, page 27