Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020147

EP2020147 - RFID TAG WITH PROGRAMMABLE READ RANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.06.2010
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2010Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.07.2010  [2010/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Symbol Technologies, Inc.
One Symbol Plaza
Holtsville, NY 11742 / US
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / SOLEIMANI, Mohammad
12413 Falconbridge Drive
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date07776904.009.05.2007
[2009/06]
WO2007US11163
Priority number, dateUS2006044009425.05.2006         Original published format: US 440094
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007139665
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020147
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04Q5/22
[2009/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:RFID-ETIKETT MIT PROGRAMMIERBAREM LESEBEREICH[2009/06]
English:RFID TAG WITH PROGRAMMABLE READ RANGE[2009/06]
French:ÉTIQUETTE RFID AVEC GAMME DE LECTURE PROGRAMMABLE[2009/06]
Entry into regional phase20.11.2008National basic fee paid 
20.11.2008Search fee paid 
20.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
20.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
21.06.2010Application withdrawn by applicant  [2010/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XP]US2006187046  (KRAMER BRADLEY A [US]);
 [X]US7030731  (FREIWALD DEAN [US], et al);
 [Y]US6285342  (BRADY MICHAEL JOHN [US], et al)