Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022083

EP2022083 - SELECTIVE EPITAXIAL FORMATION OF SEMICONDUCTOR FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.05.2009
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 03.06.2009  [2009/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASM America, Inc.
3440 East University Drive
Phoenix, AZ 85034-7200 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / BAUER, Matthias
7205 S. Golfisde Lane
Phoenix, Arizona 85042 / US
02 / WEEKS, Keith, Doran
730 S. Golden Key
Gilbert, Arizona 85233 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)polypatent
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Polypatent
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date07777014.711.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US11464
Priority number, dateUS20060811703P07.06.2006         Original published format: US 811703 P
US2006053646328.09.2006         Original published format: US 536463
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007145758
Date:21.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2022083
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/20
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SELEKTIVE EPITAKTISCHE BILDUNG VON HALBLEITERSCHICHTEN[2009/07]
English:SELECTIVE EPITAXIAL FORMATION OF SEMICONDUCTOR FILMS[2009/07]
French:FORMATION DE COUCHES À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR PAR ÉPITAXIE SÉLECTIVE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2008National basic fee paid 
12.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
11.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
12.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.04.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/23]
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006115934  (KIM YIHWAN [US], et al) [X] 1-14,16,17,25-28,30-43,45,46 * paragraphs [0019] - [0030]; claim - *;
 [X]US2005176220  (KANEMOTO KEI [JP]) [X] 1-14,16,17,25-28,30-43,45,46 * paragraphs [0064] - [0074]; claim - *;
 [X]US2002022347  (PARK JUNG-WOO [KR], et al) [X] 1-14,16,17,25-28,30-43,45,46 * paragraphs [0021] - [0028]; figure 1; claim - *;
 [A]US2004185665  (KISHIMOTO DAISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-46 * paragraphs [0036] - [0066]; figure - *;
 [PX]US2007006800  (LEE DEOK-HYUNG [KR], et al) [PX] 15,18-24,29,44 * paragraphs [0035] , [0036] , [0059] , [0061]; figure 3 *
 [X]  - CHOWDHURY A I ET AL, "IN-SITU REAL-TIME MASS SPECTROSCOPIC SENSING AND MASS BALANCE MODELING OF SELECTIVE AREA SILICON PECVD", AIP CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, NEW YORK,NY, US, (19980323), no. 449, ISSN 0094-243X, pages 363 - 367, XP009041607 [X] 1-14,16,17,25-28,30-43,45,46 * page 363 - page 364 *
 [X]  - SMITH L L ET AL, "Plasma enhanced selective area microcrystalline silicon deposition on hydrogenated amorphous silicon: Surface modification for controlled nucleation", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY A. VACUUM, SURFACES AND FILMS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199805), vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 0734-2101, pages 1316 - 1320, XP012003944 [X] 1-14,16,17,25-28,30-43,45,46 * Abstract; II. EXPERIMENT *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.581144