Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027119

EP2027119 - ETHERS, SECONDARY AMINES AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF AS MODULATORS OF THE 5-HT2A SEROTONIN RECEPTOR USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISORDERS RELATED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.01.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.09.2018  [2018/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
6154 Nancy Ridge Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2013/25]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
6166 Nancy Ridge Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-3223 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TEEGARDEN, Bradley
11933 Windom Peak Way
San Diego, California 92131 / US
02 / CHAPMAN, Dennis
4779 Ms. Ashmun Drive
San Diego, California 92111 / US
03 / DECAIRE, Marc
10504 Caminito Alvarez
San Diego, California 92126 / US
04 / DOSA, Peter, I.
8458 Summerdale Road, No. B
San Diego, California 92126 / US
05 / FEICHTINGER, Konrad
3533 6th Avenue, Apt. 3
San Diego, California 92103 / US
06 / JAYAKUMAR, Honnappa
5555 Porter Creek Road
San Diego, California 92130 / US
07 / STRAH-PLEYNET, Sonja
12542 Darkwood Road
San Diego, California 92129 / US
08 / TRAN, Thuy-Anh
4833 Fairport Way
San Diego, California 92130 / US
09 / XU, Jingdong
11184 Visa Sorrento Parkway, No. 304
San Diego, California 92130 / US
 [2009/13]
Former [2009/09]01 / TEEGARDEN, Bradley
11933 Windom Peak Way
San Diego, California 92131 / US
02 / CHAPMAN, Dennis
4779 Ms. Ashmun Drive
San Diego, California 92111 / US
03 / DECAIRE, Marc
10504 Caminito Alvarez
San Diego, California 92126 / US
04 / DOSA, Peter, I.
8458 Summerdale Road, No. B
San Diego, California 92126 / US
05 / FEICHTINGER, Konrad
3533 6th Avenue, Apt. 3
San Diego, California 92103 / US
06 / JAYAKUMAR, Honnappa
5555 Porter Creek Road
San Diego, California 92130 / US
07 / STRAH-PLEYNET, Sonja
12542 Darkwood Road
San Diego, California 92129 / US
08 / TRAN, Thuy-Anh
4833 Fairport Way
San Diego, California 92130 / US
09 / XU, Jingdong
10936 Avenida De Los Lobos
San Diego, California 92127 / US
Representative(s)Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Application number, filing date07777114.517.05.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007US11789
Priority number, dateUS20060801699P18.05.2006         Original published format: US 801699 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007136680
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2027119
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:C07D413/12, C07D231/12, C07D231/16, C07D403/12, C07D411/12, A61K31/42, A61K31/4192, A61K31/427
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesAL27.03.2008
BA27.03.2008
HR27.03.2008
MK27.03.2008
RS27.03.2008
TitleGerman:ETHER, SEKUNDÄRE AMINE UND DERIVATE DAVON ALS MODULATOREN DES 5-HT2A-SEROTONIN-REZEPTORS ZUR BEHANDLUNG DAMIT ZUSAMMENHÄNGENDER ERKRANKUNGEN[2009/09]
English:ETHERS, SECONDARY AMINES AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF AS MODULATORS OF THE 5-HT2A SEROTONIN RECEPTOR USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISORDERS RELATED THERETO[2009/09]
French:ÉTHERS, AMINES SECONDAIRES ET LEURS DÉRIVÉS UTILISÉS EN TANT QUE MODULATEURS DES RÉCEPTEURS 5-HT2A DE LA SÉROTONINE ET UTILES POUR TRAITER LES TROUBLES LIÉS À CES RÉCEPTEURS[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2008National basic fee paid 
27.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
18.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
14.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
19.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
21.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/39]
09.05.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/39]
Divisional application(s)EP18164223.2
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.12.2011
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
11.09.2017Request for further processing filed
11.09.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.10.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
05.12.2016Request for further processing filed
05.12.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.12.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
26.02.2016Request for further processing filed
26.02.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.03.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
13.01.2015Request for further processing filed
13.01.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.01.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
10.10.2012Request for further processing filed
10.10.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.10.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
20.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
21.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
26.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
24.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
12.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201206   M06   Fee paid on   20.11.2012
31.05.201711   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2017
31.05.201812   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO2006055734  (ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-46 * see compounds of claim 1 as modulators of 5-HT2A receptors wherein X is oxygen, V is O or NR10 *;
 [Y]WO2005012254  (ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-46 * see compounds of claim 1 as modulators of 5-HT2A receptors wherein R5 is substituted alkoxy *;
 [Y]WO03062206  (ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-46 * as modulators of 5-HT2A receptors wherein A is carbonyl, equivalence of q being 1 or 0 and equivalence of R1 being absent or a substituent as defined in claim 1 *