Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2019703

EP2019703 - IV catheter assembly with an ergonomic needle grip [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/06]IV CATHETER ASSEMBLY WITH AN ERGONOMIC NEEDLE GRIP
[2010/34]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.11.2011
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Becton Dickinson and Company
One Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
Becton, Dickinson & Company
1 Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HANNER, Gert
Grindvagen 2
S-263 93 Mjohult / SE
02 / HAGER, Jorgen, Bruno
Jonkopingsgatan 83
S-25250 Helsingborg / SE
03 / SODERHOLM, Karl Johan, Marten
Harlyckegatan 5b
S-256 58 Helsingborg / SE
04 / GLOWACKI, Kristoffer
Breidablick 11
S-24532 Staffanstorp / SE
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2009/06]Weber, Thomas
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date07777178.018.05.2007
[2009/06]
WO2007US12037
Priority number, dateUS2006043948122.05.2006         Original published format: US 439481
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007139741
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2019703
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2019703
Date:12.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/06, A61M5/158
[2009/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:IV-Katheteranordnung mit ergonomischem Nadelgriff[2010/34]
English:IV catheter assembly with an ergonomic needle grip[2010/34]
French:Ensemble de cathéter intraveineux à élément de préhension d'aiguille ergonomique[2010/34]
Former [2009/06]IV-KATHETERANORDNUNG MIT ERGONOMISCHEM NADELGRIFF
Former [2009/06]IV CATHETER ASSEMBLY WITH AN ERGONOMIC NEEDLE GRIP
Former [2009/06]ENSEMBLE DE CATHÉTER INTRAVEINEUX À ÉLÉMENT DE PRÉHENSION D'AIGUILLE ERGONOMIQUE
Entry into regional phase18.11.2008National basic fee paid 
18.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
30.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2010Fee for grant paid
30.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.01.2011
BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
HU12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
RO12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
TR12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
IE18.05.2011
LU18.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT12.01.2011
BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
RO12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
TR12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
IE18.05.2011
LU18.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2013/25]AT12.01.2011
BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
RO12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
IE18.05.2011
LU18.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/20]AT12.01.2011
BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
RO12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
IE18.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/07]AT12.01.2011
BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
RO12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
CH31.05.2011
LI31.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2012/05]AT12.01.2011
BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
RO12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
MC31.05.2011
Former [2011/49]AT12.01.2011
BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
RO12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
Former [2011/47]AT12.01.2011
BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
Former [2011/38]AT12.01.2011
BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
Former [2011/37]BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
Former [2011/36]LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
SE12.01.2011
GR13.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0281421  (LUTHER MEDICAL PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 23; figures 1-4a * [A] 5,7,12,13,17,19,24,25;
 [XY]WO03075995  (EMMEBI S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-7,10-13,16-23;
 [YA]WO02096493  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [Y] 2-7,10-13,16-23 * paragraphs [0016] - [0028]; figures 1-3,9 * * paragraphs [0040] - [0042] * [A] 1,24-28;
 [XA]US3595230  (SUYEOKA GEORGE M, et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 41 - column 6, line 16 * [A] 13,24;
 [A]EP0606695  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-7,13,24 * column 5, lines 11-49; figures 6,7 *;
 [A]EP0034879  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] 1,13,24 * page 6, line 21 - page 12, line 15; figures 1-6 *